EP2449666 - POWER TRANSFER DEVICES, METHODS, AND SYSTEMS WITH CROWBAR SWITCH SHUNTING ENERGY-TRANSFER REACTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ideal Power Inc. 4120 Freidrich Lane, Suite 100 Austin, TX 78744 / US | [2014/46] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states Ideal Power Inc. 7105 Valburn Dr. Austin, TX 78731 / US | ||
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Ideal Power Converters, Inc. 7105 Valburn Dr. Austin, TX 78731 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEXANDER, William, C. 1225 Overlook Circle Spicewood TX 78669 / US | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2013/17] | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/15] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/19] | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10800310.4 | 29.06.2010 | WO2010US40504 | Priority number, date | US20090221345P | 29.06.2009 Original published format: US 221345 P | US20090234373P | 17.08.2009 Original published format: US 234373 P | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011008567 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2449666 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/06, H02M5/297 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
H02M5/225 (EP,US);
H02M5/06 (KR);
H02M5/458 (US);
H02M5/275 (US);
H02M5/293 (KR);
H02M7/4807 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | H02M5/293, H02M5/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | STROMÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, -VERFAHREN UND -SYSTEME MIT CROWBAR-SCHALTUNGS-NEBENSCHLUSS-ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNGSREAKTANZ | [2012/19] | English: | POWER TRANSFER DEVICES, METHODS, AND SYSTEMS WITH CROWBAR SWITCH SHUNTING ENERGY-TRANSFER REACTANCE | [2012/19] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE À PROTECTEUR À THYRISTOR COURT-CIRCUITANT UNE BOBINE D'INDUCTANCE DE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/02] | 04.02.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/02] | 19.02.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Appeal following examination | 21.04.2015 | Appeal received No. T1435/15 | 18.11.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2012 | 30.06.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2013 | 30.06.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4730242 (DIVAN DEEPAKRAJ M [US]) [A] 1-13 * figure 7 *; | [XI]GB2200259 (KONE ELEVATOR GMBH) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * [I] 5; | [XI]EP0704961 (KONE OY [FI]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * [I] 5; | [I]US2008013351 (ALEXANDER WILLIAM C [US]) [I] 1-13 * figure 1 *; | [A] - YOSHIHIRO MURAI ET AL, "HIGH-FREQUENCY SERIES-RESONANT DC LINK POWER CONVERSION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19921101), vol. 28, no. 6, doi:10.1109/28.175278, ISSN 0093-9994, pages 1277 - 1285, XP000331295 [A] 1-13 * figure 1a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/28.175278 | International search | [A]US6459606 (JADRIC IVAN [US]); | [A]US2008049460 (MOHAN NED [US], et al); | [A]US6995992 (WEI LIXIANG [US], et al); | [A]US2007189044 (LIU CONGWEI [CA], et al); | [A]US6166930 (CZERWINSKI CHRISTOPHER S [US]) | Examination | DE2910788 | DE2924729 | US4812729 | US5038244 | DE4403008 | US5513058 | DE19833490 | EP1835609 | - Ned Mohan ET AL, "14-7-3 Electromagnetic Braking", Power Electronics: converters, applications and designs 2nd Edition, John Wiley & Sons Inc., (19950101), pages 421 - 421, ISBN 978-0-47-158408-7, XP055137376 | by applicant | US5903448 | US2008013351 |