EP2454376 - SIMULTANEOUS, INTEGRATED SELECTION AND EVOLUTION OF ANTIBODY/PROTEIN PERFORMANCE AND EXPRESSION IN PRODUCTION HOSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioatla, LLC 11011 Torreyana Road San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2014/14] |
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Bioatla, Llc 10190 Telesis Court San Diego, CA 92122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHORT, Jay, Milton 12985 Via Esperia Del Mar CA 92014 / US | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Mendelsohn Dunleavy, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Mendelsohn, Drucker & Dunleavy, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2013/37] | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Mendelsohn, Drucker and Dunleavy, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2013/03] | Dunleavy, Kevin James, et al Mendelsohn, Drucker & Associates, P.C. p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2012/21] | Dunleavy, Kevin James Knoble & Yoshida LLC p/o De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 10800618.0 | 16.07.2010 | [2015/49] | WO2010US42302 | Priority number, date | US20090271168P | 17.07.2009 Original published format: US 271168 P | [2012/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011009058 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2454376 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2454376 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C07K16/00, C40B50/06 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
C12N15/1058 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N15/63 (KR);
C40B30/04 (US);
C07K16/00 (CN,US);
C07K16/18 (KR);
C12N15/85 (KR);
C12P21/02 (CN);
C40B50/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,CN,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/21] | C12P21/08, C12N5/071 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEICHZEITIGE INTEGRIERTE AUSWAHL UND ENTWICKLUNG VON ANTIKÖRPER/PROTEIN-LEISTUNGEN UND IHRE EXPRESSION IN PRODUKTIONSWIRTEN | [2012/21] | English: | SIMULTANEOUS, INTEGRATED SELECTION AND EVOLUTION OF ANTIBODY/PROTEIN PERFORMANCE AND EXPRESSION IN PRODUCTION HOSTS | [2012/21] | French: | SÉLECTION ET ÉVOLUTION INTÉGRÉES SIMULTANÉES DE LA PERFORMANCE ET DE L EXPRESSION D UN ANTICORPS/D UNE PROTÉINE CHEZ DES HÔTES DE PRODUCTION | [2012/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 30.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15156820.1 / EP2907873 | EP16157965.1 / EP3042957 | EP16196481.2 / EP3156485 | EP18183032.4 / EP3406717 | EP19210622.7 / EP3636759 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2010 | AL | 02.12.2015 | AT | 02.12.2015 | BE | 02.12.2015 | BG | 02.12.2015 | CY | 02.12.2015 | CZ | 02.12.2015 | DK | 02.12.2015 | EE | 02.12.2015 | ES | 02.12.2015 | FI | 02.12.2015 | HR | 02.12.2015 | IT | 02.12.2015 | LT | 02.12.2015 | LV | 02.12.2015 | MK | 02.12.2015 | NL | 02.12.2015 | PL | 02.12.2015 | RO | 02.12.2015 | SE | 02.12.2015 | SI | 02.12.2015 | SK | 02.12.2015 | SM | 02.12.2015 | TR | 02.12.2015 | NO | 02.03.2016 | GR | 03.03.2016 | IS | 02.04.2016 | PT | 04.04.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
BG | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
IT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
ES | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO02092780 (DIVERSA CORP [US], et al); | [XY]WO03023032 (NAUTILUS BIOTECH [FR], et al); | [XY]WO2005003345 (CREA & CO R [US], et al); | [A]WO2007047578 (MEDIMMUNE INC [US], et al); | International search | [X]US2003219752 (SHORT JAY M [US]); | [Y]US2006115850 (SCHATZ OCTAVIAN [DE]); | [Y]US2007128203 (GILES-KOMAR JILL [US], et al) |