EP2453740 - PARTICLES INCORPORATING ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carefusion 2200, Inc. 3750 Torrey View Ct. San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARDWELL, James 299 Kingspoint Drive El Paso TX 79912 / US | 02 /
TUFTS, Scott, A., Jr. 805 Twin Hills Drive El Paso CA 79912 / US | 03 /
RASCON, Aurelia, E. 11671 Rufus Brijalba El Paso CA 79936 / US | 04 /
BENITEZ, Tenoch 535 S. Mesa Hills Apt. 224 El Paso, TX 79912 / US | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10800633.9 | 16.07.2010 | WO2010US42338 | Priority number, date | US20090226382P | 17.07.2009 Original published format: US 226382 P | [2012/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011009083 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2453740 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/08, A01N43/40, A01N47/44, A01N33/12, A01N59/16, A01N25/34 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
A01N25/08 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/34 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/08, A01N43/40, A01N47/44 (EP,US);
A01N25/34, A01N43/40, A01N47/44 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2012/21] | A01N25/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Title | German: | PARTIKEL MIT ANTIMIKROBIELLEN MITTELN | [2012/21] | English: | PARTICLES INCORPORATING ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS | [2012/21] | French: | PARTICULES INCORPORANT DES AGENTS ANTIMICROBIENS | [2012/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 23.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 10.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.08.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0488269 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-11 * pages 8,9; example 7 * * page 11; table 1 * [Y] 5,12,13 [I] 5,14-17; | [X]JPH04283505 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6-11 * abstract *; | [X]US6592912 (BARABOLAK ROMAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11 * column 18; example 63 *; | [XD]WO2006034239 (UNIV IOWA STATE RES FOUND INC [US], et al) [XD] 1-3 * claims 1,25,28 *; | [Y] - EDGE M ET AL, "THE ENHANCED PERFORMANCE OF BIOCIDAL ADDITIVES IN PAINTS AND COATINGS", SPECIAL PUBLICATION - ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, LONDON, GB, (19990914), ISSN 0260-6291, pages 84 - 94, XP009046884 [Y] 5,12,13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5194250 (FAIRHURST EDGAR [US], et al); | [X]WO03009877 (ADVANCED BIOTECHNOLOGIES INTER [GB], et al); | [X]US6592912 (BARABOLAK ROMAN M [US], et al); | [A]US2006115440 (ARATA ANDREW B [US], et al); | [A]US2008026026 (LU HELEN S [US], et al); | [Y]US2009148502 (PRONOVOST ALLAN D [US]) | Examination | WO2006127172 |