EP2515856 - Aerosol Formulation for COPD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/44] | AEROSOL FORMULATION FOR COPD | ||
[2013/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A. Via Palermo, 26/A 43100 Parma / IT | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONELLI, Sauro Chiesi FarmaceuticI S.P.A. Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | 02 /
USBERTI, Francesca Chiesi Farmaceutici S.P.A. Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | 03 /
ZAMBELLI, Enrico Chiesi Farmaceutici S.P.A. Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
BONELLI, Sauro Chiesi FarmaceuticI S.P.A. Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | ||
02 /
USBERTI, Francesca Chiesi Farmaceutici S.P.A. Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | |||
03 /
ZAMBELLI, Enrico Chiesi Farmaceutici S.P.A. Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10800932.5 | 22.12.2010 | WO2010EP70476 | Priority number, date | EP20090180662 | 23.12.2009 Original published format: EP 09180662 | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011076840 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2515856 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2515856 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/12, A61P11/06, A61P11/00, A61K45/06, A61K9/00, A61K31/40 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
A61K31/40 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/12 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (KR,US);
A61K9/008 (EP,KR,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
B65B3/00 (KR,US);
B65B7/16 (KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/40, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/26] | A61K45/06, A61K31/40, A61K9/12, A61P11/06, A61P11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2011/33] | A61K9/00, A61K31/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | 18.06.2012 | ME | 18.06.2012 | Title | German: | Aerosol-Formulierung für COPD | [2013/26] | English: | Aerosol Formulation for COPD | [2013/26] | French: | Formule d'aérosol pour COPD | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/44] | AEROSOLFORMULIERUNG FÜR COPD | ||
Former [2012/44] | AEROSOL FORMULATION FOR COPD | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 21.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2010 | AL | 02.04.2014 | CY | 02.04.2014 | CZ | 02.04.2014 | DK | 02.04.2014 | EE | 02.04.2014 | FI | 02.04.2014 | HR | 02.04.2014 | LT | 02.04.2014 | LV | 02.04.2014 | MC | 02.04.2014 | MK | 02.04.2014 | MT | 02.04.2014 | PL | 02.04.2014 | RO | 02.04.2014 | SE | 02.04.2014 | SI | 02.04.2014 | SK | 02.04.2014 | SM | 02.04.2014 | TR | 02.04.2014 | BG | 02.07.2014 | NO | 02.07.2014 | IS | 02.08.2014 | PT | 04.08.2014 | RS | 19.11.2014 | LU | 22.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MK | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
TR | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
TR | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004101483 (MULLER-WALZ RUDI [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * example 4; claims 1-52 *; | [Y]WO2008000482 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 4; claims 1-17 *; | [Y]WO2005074900 (SOFOTEC GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 3, paragraph 3; example 2; claims 1-23 *; | [Y]US2006257324 (LEWIS DAVID A [IT], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0044] , [0111]; examples 1-7; claims 1-26 * | [Y] - "Glycopyrronium Bromide", Martindale The complete drug reference, Pharmaceutical Press, (20020101), vol. 33, pages 467 - 467, ISBN 0853694990, XP002579323 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2005107873 | WO0176575 | WO2006100453 | WO03053501 | WO0149350 | - HANSEL ET AL., CHEST, (2005), vol. 128, pages 1974 - 1979 |