EP2501319 - HUMAN-ROBOT SHARED CONTROL FOR ENDOSCOPIC ASSISTANT ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POPOVIC, Aleksandra P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarborough Road Briarcliff Manor New York 10510-8001 / US | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 10800996.0 | 15.11.2010 | WO2010IB55175 | Priority number, date | US20090261390P | 16.11.2009 Original published format: US 261390 P | [2012/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011058530 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2501319 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B34/37 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00203 (EP,US);
A61B2034/301 (EP,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Title | German: | GEMEINSAM GENUTZTE MENSCH-ROBOTER-STEUERUNG FÜR EINEN ROBOTER ZUR ENDOSKOPIEUNTERSTÜTZUNG | [2012/39] | English: | HUMAN-ROBOT SHARED CONTROL FOR ENDOSCOPIC ASSISTANT ROBOT | [2012/39] | French: | COMMANDE PARTAGÉE HUMAIN-MACHINE POUR ASSISTANT ROBOT ENDOSCOPIQUE | [2012/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 03.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5078140 (KWOH YIK S [US]) [A] 1-17* column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 2 *; | [AD]US2007142823 (PRISCO GIUSEPPE M [US], et al) [AD] 1-17 * paragraphs [0039] , [0040] , [0087] *; | [A]US2009157092 (BLUMENKRANZ STEPHEN J [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0057] , [0058]; figures 3,4 * | by applicant | US2007142823 | - SASHI S. KOMMU ET AL., "Initial Experience With The Endoassist Camera-Holding Robot In Laparoscopic Urological Surgery", J ROBOTIC SURG, (2007), vol. 1, pages 133 - 137 | - A. AREZZO ET AL., "Experimental Assessment Of A New Mechanical Endoscopic Solosurgery System", SURG ENDOSC, (2005), vol. 19, pages 581 - 588 | - KWON ET AL., Intelligent Laparoscopic Assistant Robot Through Surgery Task Model: How To Give Intelligence To Medical Robots | US19900612613 |