EP2516395 - (METHYLSULFONYL) ETHYL BENZENE ISOINDOLINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR THERAPEUTICAL USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celgene Corporation 86 Morris Avenue Summit, NJ 07901 / US | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAFER, Peter, H. 126 John E. Busch Avenue Somerset NJ 08873 / US | 02 /
FRANK, Anthony, J. 139 Clover Hollow Road Easton PA 18045 / US | 03 /
MAN, Hon-Wah 27 Grant Way Princeton NJ 08540 / US | 04 /
SHANKAR, Sai, L. 205 Recklesstown Way Chesterfield NJ 08515 / US | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10801055.4 | 21.12.2010 | WO2010US61420 | Priority number, date | US20090289356P | 22.12.2009 Original published format: US 289356 P | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011079091 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2516395 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/46, C07D407/12, A61K31/403, A61P35/00, A61P29/00, A61P17/00 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
C07D209/46 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/12 (KR);
A61K31/403 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | (METHYLSULFONYL)-ETHYLBENZOLISOINDOLINDERIVATE UND IHRE THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG | [2012/44] | English: | (METHYLSULFONYL) ETHYL BENZENE ISOINDOLINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR THERAPEUTICAL USES | [2012/44] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE (MÉTHYLSULFONYL)-ÉTHYLBENZÈNE-ISOINDOLINE ET UTILISATIONS THÉRAPEUTIQUES ASSOCIÉES | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 17.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 31.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0134606 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,13 * page 67, line 26 - line 27; example 58 *[I] 1-14 | by applicant | US3536809 | US3598123 | US3845770 | US3916899 | US4008719 | US5059595 | US5073543 | US5120548 | US5134127 | US5354556 | US5591767 | US5632984 | US5635517 | US5639476 | US5674533 | WO9803502 | US5733566 | US5770589 | US5800819 | WO9854170 | US6001368 | US6015803 | US6218369 | US6225348 | US6281230 | US2002054899 | US2004029832 | US2004087546 | US2004091455 | US2004190609 | US2004220144 | WO2004103274 | US2005100529 | US2005143344 | US2005143420 | US2005203142 | US2005214328 | US2005222209 | US2005239842 | US2006030594 | US2006122228 | US2006154880 | US2006188475 | US2007048327 | - LOWC; CHCNG, DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (1992), vol. 17, no. 9, pages 799 - 807 | - TRACEY ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 330, pages 662 - 664 | - HINSHAW ET AL., CIRC. SHOCK, (1990), vol. 30, pages 279 - 292 | - DEZUBE ET AL., LANCEL, (1990), vol. 335, no. 8690, page 662 | - BCAVO; REITSNYDER, TRENDS IN PHARM., (1990), vol. 11, pages 150 - 155 | - VERGHESE ET AL., JOURNAL OF PHAMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, (1995), vol. 272, no. 3, pages 1313 - 1320 | - Burger's Medicinal Chemistry and Drug Discovery, (1995), vol. 172-178, pages 949 - 982 | - JENS T. CARSTCNSCN, Drug Stability: Principles & Practice, MARCEL DEKKER, (1995), pages 379 - 80 |