EP2506952 - ABSORBENT SOLUTION CONTAINING A BREAKDOWN INHIBITOR DERIVED FROM PYRIMIDINE OR FROM TRIAZINE AND ABSORPTION PROCESS FOR ACID COMPOUNDS CONTAINED IN A GASEOUS EFFLUENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, Avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELFORT, Bruno 15 rue Broca F-75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
CARRETTE, Pierre-Louis 27 rue des Granges F-69005 Lyon / FR | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/41] | Application number, filing date | 10801598.3 | 19.11.2010 | [2015/34] | WO2010FR00775 | Priority number, date | FR20090005753 | 30.11.2009 Original published format: FR 0905753 | [2012/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011064470 | Date: | 03.06.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2506952 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2506952 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14, B01D53/34, B01D53/40 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
B01D53/1493 (EP,US);
B01D53/1456 (EP,US);
C07C211/14 (EP,US);
C07C215/08 (EP,US);
C07C215/10 (EP,US);
C07C229/08 (EP,US);
C07C309/14 (EP,US);
B01D2252/103 (EP,US);
B01D2252/20405 (EP,US);
B01D2252/20421 (EP,US);
B01D2252/20484 (EP,US);
B01D2252/604 (EP,US);
B01D2257/302 (EP,US);
B01D2257/304 (EP,US);
B01D2257/306 (EP,US);
B01D2257/308 (EP,US);
B01D2257/404 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2258/0233 (EP,US);
B01D2258/0291 (EP,US);
B01D2258/05 (EP,US);
Y02P20/151 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSORPTIONSLÖSUNG MIT EINEM ABBAUHEMMER AUS PYRIMIDIN ODER TRIAZIN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABSORPTION VON SÄUREVERBINDUNGEN IN EINEM ABGAS | [2012/41] | English: | ABSORBENT SOLUTION CONTAINING A BREAKDOWN INHIBITOR DERIVED FROM PYRIMIDINE OR FROM TRIAZINE AND ABSORPTION PROCESS FOR ACID COMPOUNDS CONTAINED IN A GASEOUS EFFLUENT | [2012/41] | French: | SOLUTION ABSORBANTE CONTENANT UN INHIBITEUR DE DÉGRADATION. DÉRIVÉ DE LA PYRIMIDINE OU DE LA TRIAZINE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ABSORPTION DE COMPOSÉS ACIDES CONTENUS DANS UN EFFLUENT GAZEUX | [2012/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 14.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2010 | AL | 19.08.2015 | AT | 19.08.2015 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | ES | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | HR | 19.08.2015 | IT | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | MK | 19.08.2015 | MT | 19.08.2015 | PL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | RS | 19.08.2015 | SE | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | SM | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | IE | 19.11.2015 | LU | 19.11.2015 | GR | 20.11.2015 | BE | 30.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | PT | 21.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.11.2010 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 19.11.2015 | ||
LU | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 19.11.2010 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 19.11.2015 | ||
LU | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 19.11.2015 | ||
LU | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2655543 (LINCH ADRIAN L) [Y] 1-12 * column 5, line 11 - line 16 * * claims 1-21 * * column 1, line 1 - line 5 *; | [Y]WO9910561 (BETZDEARBORN INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [I]US2005202967 (HOEFER FRANK [DE], et al) [I] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2009156619 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR], et al) [AP] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - Mechanical design and operation of ehtanolamine plants ED - Arthur L Kohl; Fred C Riesenfeld, GAS PURIFICATION, GULF PUBLISHING COMPANY, PAGE(S) 91 - 123, (19790101), ISBN 9780872013131, XP009111641 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - BUTWELL K F ET AL, "Alkanolamine treating", HYDROCARBON PROCESSING, GULF PUBLISHING CO. HOUSTON, US, (19820301), no. 3, ISSN 0018-8190, pages 108 - 116, XP009111638 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2820430 | US5686016 | US7056482 |