EP2461914 - WRAPPING AN OBJECT WITH A FILM USING A TAPE FOR CUTTING THE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van Den Berghe, Garry Cyrille 709 Mt. York Drive Coldstream, British Columbia V1B 3X2 / CA | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMBORSKY, Robert 534 Community Row Winnipeg Manitoba R3R 1H5 / CA | 02 /
VAN DEN BERGHE, Garry Cyrille 709 Mt. York Drive, Coldstream British Columbia VIB 3X2 / CA | [2013/16] |
Former [2012/24] | 01 /
AMBORSKY, Robert 534 Community Row Winnipeg Manitoba R3R 1H5 / CA | Representative(s) | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2012/24] | Croston, David, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10801812.8 | 25.06.2010 | WO2010CA00934 | Priority number, date | US20090226947P | 20.07.2009 Original published format: US 226947 P | US20090580838 | 16.10.2009 Original published format: US 580838 | CA20092686003 | 16.10.2009 Original published format: CA 2686003 | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011009191 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2461914 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2461914 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 27.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/32, B29C63/02, B32B7/12, B65B11/00, B44C1/10, B44C1/17 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
B44C1/1733 (EP,US);
B44C1/105 (EP,US);
C09J7/201 (EP,US);
C09J7/22 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1064 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1066 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1082 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1168 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1495 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/14] | B05D1/32, B29C63/02, B32B7/12, B65B11/00, B44C1/10 | ||
Former IPC [2012/24] | B05D1/32, B29C63/02, B32B7/12, B65B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMWICKELN EINES OBJEKTS MIT EINER FOLIE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES BANDS ZUM SCHNEIDEN DER FOLIE | [2012/24] | English: | WRAPPING AN OBJECT WITH A FILM USING A TAPE FOR CUTTING THE FILM | [2012/24] | French: | ENVELOPPEMENT D'OBJET AVEC FILM UTILISANT UN RUBAN POUR COUPER LE FILM | [2012/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 18.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13174593.7 / EP2650142 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2010 | AL | 14.08.2013 | AT | 14.08.2013 | BG | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | CZ | 14.08.2013 | EE | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | HR | 14.08.2013 | LT | 14.08.2013 | LV | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | MK | 14.08.2013 | MT | 14.08.2013 | RO | 14.08.2013 | SI | 14.08.2013 | SK | 14.08.2013 | SM | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | NO | 14.11.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | IS | 14.12.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 25.06.2010 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MK | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 25.06.2010 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 25.06.2010 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 14.08.2013 | |
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 14.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6017079 (WARNER JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 3 - column 5 * * figure 7 *; | [A]US2007284046 (HABISREITINGER UWE [DE], et al) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0036] - [0040] * | International search | [X]US4255469 (MCGINNESS PATRICK J); | [Y]US6235365 (SCHAUGHENCY EDWIN C [US], et al); | [X]US6875469 (LANGEMAN GARY D [CA]); | [X]US2006266464 (WHITE MARK [US]) |