EP2458021 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING REDUCED IRON USING ALKALI-CONTAINING IRON PRODUCTION DUST AS THE RAW MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho 10-26 Wakinohama-cho 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugiyama Takeshi c/o kobe Steel,Ltd 10-26 Wakinohama-cho 2-chome,Chuo-ku Kobe-Shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | 02 /
Yoshida Shohei c/oKobe Steel,Ltd 10-26 Wakinohama-cho 2-chome Chuo-ku,Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | 03 /
Fujita Kyoichiro c/oKobe S,ltd 10-26 Wakinohama -cho 2-chome,Chuo-ku Kobe-Shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | 04 /
Misawa Ryota c/o Kobe Steel ,ltd 10-26 Wakinohama -cho 2-chome,Chuo-ku Kobe-Shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10802289.8 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010JP62256 | Priority number, date | JP20090169718 | 21.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009169718 | [2012/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011010669 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2458021 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C21B13/10, C22B1/16 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
C22B1/243 (EP,US);
C21B13/10 (KR);
C21B13/105 (EP,US);
C22B1/16 (KR);
C22B1/245 (EP,US);
C22B5/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REDUZIERTEM EISEN MIT ALKALIHALTIGEM EISENPRODUKTIONSSTAUB ALS ROHMATERIAL | [2012/22] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING REDUCED IRON USING ALKALI-CONTAINING IRON PRODUCTION DUST AS THE RAW MATERIAL | [2012/22] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE FER RÉDUIT METTANT EN UVRE UNE POUSSIÈRE DE PRODUCTION DE FER ALCALIN EN TANT QUE MATIÈRE PREMIÈRE | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2012 | Translation filed | 19.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 03.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH11310832 (LTV STEEL CO INC, et al); | [A]JP2002097508 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]US3836353 (HOLLEY C); | [A]WO2009035053 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008056986 (HAMADA HEAVY IND LTD, et al); | [A]JP2000034526 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JP2006283136 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) | by applicant | JP2003293019 | JP2003293020 | JP2009052141 | JP2003129142 | JP2004256868 | JPH11217615 | JP2009007667 | JP2009169718 |