EP2456891 - UNIVERSAL MICROBIAL DIAGNOSIS, DETECTION, QUANTIFICATION, AND SPECIMEN-TARGETED THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Southwest Regional PCR, LLC 4321 Marsha Sharp Freeway Lubbock, TX 79407 / US | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLCOTT, Randall D. 5602 Orlando Avenue Lubbock, TX 79413 / US | 02 /
KENNEDY, John P. 125 Busbridge Cove Pooler, GA 31322 / US | 03 /
DOWD, Scot E. P.O. Box 1332 Shallowater, TX 79407 / US | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Predazzi, Valentina, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Predazzi, Valentina, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma (RM) / IT | Application number, filing date | 10802574.3 | 26.07.2010 | WO2010US02099 | Priority number, date | US20090271675P | 24.07.2009 Original published format: US 271675 P | US20090278054P | 02.10.2009 Original published format: US 278054 P | US20100399915P | 20.07.2010 Original published format: US 399915 P | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011011094 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2456891 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12P19/34 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6809, C12Q2525/15, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2563/179 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLE MIKROBENDIAGNOSE, -ERKENNUNG, -QUANTIFIZIERUNG UND AUF PROBEN ABZIELENDE THERAPIE | [2012/22] | English: | UNIVERSAL MICROBIAL DIAGNOSIS, DETECTION, QUANTIFICATION, AND SPECIMEN-TARGETED THERAPY | [2012/22] | French: | DIAGNOSTIC, DÉTECTION, QUANTIFICATION MICROBIENS UNIVERSELS, ET THÉRAPIE CIBLÉE SUR UN ÉCHANTILLON | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 02.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 08.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - SCOT E. DOWD ET AL, "Polymicrobial Nature of Chronic Diabetic Foot Ulcer Biofilm Infections Determined Using Bacterial Tag Encoded FLX Amplicon Pyrosequencing (bTEFAP)", PLOS ONE, (20081003), vol. 3, no. 10, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0003326, page e3326, XP055053762 [X] 1-9,12 * the whole document * [Y] 10,11,13-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0003326 | [XY] - DOWD SCOT E ET AL, "Evaluation of the bacterial diversity in the feces of cattle using 16S rDNA bacterial tag-encoded FLX amplicon pyrosequencing (bTEFAP)", BMC MICROBIOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, GB, (20080724), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 1471-2180, page 125, XP021033303 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [Y] 9-16 | [XY] - T. R. CALLAWAY ET AL, "Evaluation of the bacterial diversity in cecal contents of laying hens fed various molting diets by using bacterial tag-encoded FLX amplicon pyrosequencing", POULTRY SCIENCE, (20090201), vol. 88, no. 2, doi:10.3382/ps.2008-00222, ISSN 0032-5791, pages 298 - 302, XP055053764 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [Y] 9-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3382/ps.2008-00222 | [XY] - DOWD S E ET AL, "Bacterial tag-encoded FLX amplicon pyrosequencing (bTEFAP) for microbiome studies: Bacterial diversity in the ileum of newly weaned Salmonella-infected pigs", FOODBORNE PATHOGENS AND DISEASE 20080801 US, (20080801), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 1535-3141, pages 459 - 472, XP002692354 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [Y] 9-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/FPD.2008.0107 | [XY] - DOWD SCOT E ET AL, "Survey of bacterial diversity in chronic wounds using Pyrosequencing, DGGE, and full ribosome shotgun sequencing", BMC MICROBIOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, GB, (20080306), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 1471-2180, page 43, XP021033343 [X] 1-3,6-9,12 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5,10,11,13-16 | [XY] - RUTH ANN LUNA ET AL, "DNA Pyrosequencing-Based Bacterial Pathogen Identification in a Pediatric Hospital Setting", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 45, no. 9, doi:10.1128/JCM.00630-07, ISSN 0095-1137, (20070901), pages 2985 - 2992, (20070725), XP008150383 [X] 1,2,6-11 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5,12-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.00630-07 | International search | [Y] - DOWD ET AL., "Evaluation of the bacterial diversity in the feces of cattle using 16S rDNA bacterial tag-encoded FLX amplicon pyrosequencing (bTEFAP).", BMC MICROBIOL, vol. 8, no. 125, (20080724), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.biomedcentral.com/1471-2180/8/125, (20101018), XP021033303 | [X] - LUNA ET AL., "DNA pyrosequencing-based bacterial pathogen identification in a pediatric hospital setting.", J CLIN MICROBIOL, (200709), vol. 45, no. 9, pages 2985 - 2992, XP008150383 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.00630-07 | [Y] - DOWD ET AL., "Survey of bacterial diversity in chronic wounds using pyrosequencing, DGGE, and full ribosome shotgun sequencing", BMC MICROBIOL, vol. 8, no. 43, (20080306), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://www.biomedcentral.com/1471-2180/8/43, (20101018), XP021033343 | [Y] - BUDHANI ET AL., "Interaction of Streptococcus pneumoniae and Moraxella catarrhalis: Investigation of the Indirect Pathogenic Role of beta-Lactamase- Producing Moraxellae by Use of a Continuous-Culture Biofilm System.", ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (199810), vol. 42, no. 10, pages 2521 - 2526, XP008150419 | [Y] - DETHLEFSEN ET AL., "The Pervasive Effects of an Antibiotic on the Human Gut Microbiota, as Revealed by Deep 16S rRNA Sequencing", PLOS BIOLOGY, vol. 6, no. 11, (20081118), pages 1 - 18, URL: http://www.plosbiology.org/article/info:doi%2F10.1371%2FjoumaLpbio.0060280, (20101018), XP008150420 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pbio.0060280 | [A] - PETROSINO ET AL., "Metagenomic pyrosequencing and microbial identification.", CLIN. CHEM., (200905), vol. 55, no. 5, pages 856 - 866, XP008150421 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2008.107565 |