EP2457174 - ADAPTIVE STREAMING FOR DIGITAL CONTENT DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Netflix, Inc. 100 Winchester Circle Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Anthony Neal 1140 Phelps Ave. San Jose California 95117 / US | 02 /
WEI, Wei 3400 Stevenson Blvd. Apt I-31 Fremont California 94538 / US | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2012/50] | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2012/22] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10802974.5 | 23.07.2010 | [2017/41] | WO2010US43103 | Priority number, date | US20090509364 | 24.07.2009 Original published format: US 509364 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011011717 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2457174 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2457174 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2343, H04N21/439, H04N21/44, H04N21/442, H04N21/845 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N21/2223 (US);
H04N21/23406 (US);
H04N21/23439 (EP,US);
H04N21/2387 (US);
H04N21/4392 (EP,US);
H04N21/44004 (EP,US);
H04N21/44209 (EP,US);
H04N21/462 (US);
H04N21/6125 (US);
H04N21/6379 (US);
H04N21/8456 (EP,US);
H04N7/173 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/22] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVES STREAMING ZUR VERTEILUNG DIGITALER INHALTE | [2012/22] | English: | ADAPTIVE STREAMING FOR DIGITAL CONTENT DISTRIBUTION | [2012/22] | French: | FLUX CONTINU ADAPTATIF POUR UNE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU NUMÉRIQUE | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 18.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2010 | AL | 11.10.2017 | AT | 11.10.2017 | CY | 11.10.2017 | CZ | 11.10.2017 | EE | 11.10.2017 | ES | 11.10.2017 | FI | 11.10.2017 | HR | 11.10.2017 | IT | 11.10.2017 | LT | 11.10.2017 | LV | 11.10.2017 | MC | 11.10.2017 | MK | 11.10.2017 | PL | 11.10.2017 | PT | 11.10.2017 | RO | 11.10.2017 | SI | 11.10.2017 | SK | 11.10.2017 | SM | 11.10.2017 | BG | 11.01.2018 | GR | 12.01.2018 | IS | 11.02.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 23.07.2010 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CY | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MK | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 23.07.2010 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008133766 (LUO WENJUN [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1, 3, 5, 6 *; | [X]US2008181221 (KAMPMANN MARKUS [DE], et al) [X] 1,10,15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0028]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2008105695 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [X]US2009116551 (NILSSON MICHAEL E [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0132]; figures 1,4 * | International search | [Y]US2005100094 (KEESMAN GERRIT J [NL]); | [Y]US2008043587 (GANDOLPH DIRK [DE], et al); | [A]US2008062322 (DEY SUJIT [US], et al); | [Y]US2008086570 (DEY SUJIT [US], et al) |