EP2515701 - ORAL CARE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIMENEZ, Eduardo 21 Manor Drive Manalapan, NJ 07725 / US | 02 /
SORRENTINO, Alan 17 Adams Drive Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US | 03 /
MOSKOVICH, Robert 20 Jensen Street East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/33] | 01 /
JIMENEZ, Eduardo 21 Manor Drive Manalapan NJ 07725 / US | ||
02 /
SORRENTINO, Alan 17 Adams Drive Cranbury NJ 08512 / US | |||
03 /
MOSKOVICH, Robert 20 Jensen Street East Brunswick NJ 08816 / US | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2012/44] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 10803181.6 | 16.12.2010 | WO2010US60877 | Priority number, date | WO2009US69408 | 23.12.2009 Original published format: PCT/US2009/069408 | WO2009US69402 | 23.12.2009 Original published format: PCT/US2009/069402 | US20100410514P | 05.11.2010 Original published format: US 410514 P | US20100423397P | 15.12.2010 Original published format: US 423397 P | US20100423414P | 15.12.2010 Original published format: US 423414 P | US20100423435P | 15.12.2010 Original published format: US 423435 P | US20100423449P | 15.12.2010 Original published format: US 423449 P | [2011/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011079029 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2515701 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2515701 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A46B11/02 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
A46B11/0027 (EP,US);
A46B9/04 (US);
A45D34/04 (US);
A45D40/04 (US);
A46B11/0024 (EP,US);
A46B11/0034 (EP,US);
A46B11/0065 (EP,US);
A46B5/0095 (US);
A46B5/021 (US);
A61C17/227 (US);
A61C19/066 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/33] | A46B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUNDPFLEGESYSTEM | [2012/44] | English: | ORAL CARE SYSTEM | [2012/44] | French: | SYSTÈME D'HYGIÈNE BUCCO-DENTAIRE | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 23.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13153378.8 / EP2589314 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.08.2014 | AT | 13.08.2014 | CY | 13.08.2014 | CZ | 13.08.2014 | DK | 13.08.2014 | EE | 13.08.2014 | FI | 13.08.2014 | HR | 13.08.2014 | LT | 13.08.2014 | LV | 13.08.2014 | MC | 13.08.2014 | MK | 13.08.2014 | MT | 13.08.2014 | PL | 13.08.2014 | RO | 13.08.2014 | RS | 13.08.2014 | SE | 13.08.2014 | SI | 13.08.2014 | SK | 13.08.2014 | SM | 13.08.2014 | BG | 13.11.2014 | NO | 13.11.2014 | GR | 14.11.2014 | IS | 13.12.2014 | PT | 15.12.2014 | LU | 16.12.2014 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | AL | 13.08.2014 | |
AT | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MK | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
TR | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
LU | 16.12.2014 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 13.08.2014 | |
AT | 13.08.2014 | ||
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MK | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
LU | 16.12.2014 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MK | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
LU | 16.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
MT | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
LU | 16.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
MC | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
LU | 16.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
SM | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
LU | 16.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SI | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
LU | 16.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
LU | 16.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
PL | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
EE | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
SK | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
DK | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
RO | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 13.08.2014 | |
CY | 13.08.2014 | ||
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
HR | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
LV | 13.08.2014 | ||
RS | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
IS | 13.12.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 13.08.2014 | |
FI | 13.08.2014 | ||
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
GR | 14.11.2014 | ||
PT | 15.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
BG | 13.11.2014 | ||
NO | 13.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 13.08.2014 | |
LT | 13.08.2014 | ||
SE | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 13.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3832224 (CHMIELEWSKI HANS GERT [DE]) [A] 1-29 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2008062935 (KANG YUN-BEUM [KR]) [A] 1-29* paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | DE3832224 | WO2008062935 |