EP2515895 - ORAL CARE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2018/07] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Wei 4 Marshall Court Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 02 /
BARNES, Virginia 115 Back Brook Road Ringoes NJ 08551 / US | 03 /
TRIVEDI, Harsh M. 30 Burniston Court Hillsborough NJ 08844 / US | 04 /
XU, Tao 160 Pine Street Newton MA 02466 / US | [2018/07] |
Former [2012/44] | 01 /
WANG, Wei 239 Bromley Place East Brunswick NJ 08816 / US | ||
02 /
BARNES, Virginia 115 Back Brook Road Ringoes NJ 08551 / US | |||
03 /
TRIVEDI, Harsh M. 30 Burniston Court Hillsborough NJ 08844 / US | |||
04 /
XU, Tao 160 Pine Street Newton MA 02466 / US | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/07] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/44] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 10803428.1 | 21.12.2010 | [2018/07] | WO2010US61491 | Priority number, date | US20090288359P | 21.12.2009 Original published format: US 288359 P | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011084781 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2515895 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2515895 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/19, A61K36/45, A61K31/05, A61Q11/00, A61P1/02 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/05 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (US);
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/265 (EP,US);
A61K31/27 (EP,US);
A61K36/324 (US);
A61K36/45 (EP,US);
A61K8/347 (US);
A61K8/368 (US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUNDPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND -VERFAHREN | [2012/44] | English: | ORAL CARE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2012/44] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE SOIN ORAL | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 24.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2010 | AL | 14.02.2018 | AT | 14.02.2018 | CY | 14.02.2018 | CZ | 14.02.2018 | DK | 14.02.2018 | EE | 14.02.2018 | ES | 14.02.2018 | FI | 14.02.2018 | HR | 14.02.2018 | IT | 14.02.2018 | LT | 14.02.2018 | LV | 14.02.2018 | MC | 14.02.2018 | MK | 14.02.2018 | NL | 14.02.2018 | PL | 14.02.2018 | PT | 14.02.2018 | RO | 14.02.2018 | RS | 14.02.2018 | SE | 14.02.2018 | SI | 14.02.2018 | SK | 14.02.2018 | SM | 14.02.2018 | TR | 14.02.2018 | BG | 14.05.2018 | NO | 14.05.2018 | GR | 15.05.2018 | IS | 14.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MK | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9803166 (MONSANTO CO [US], et al) [X] 3 * page 13, lines 14-18 * * page 38, lines 5-14 * [Y] 1,2,10,11; | [X]US5840322 (WEISS ERVIN [IL], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * column 3, lines 58-59 * * column 6, lines 35-41 *; | [X]CA2312505 (1333366 ONTARIO INC [CA]) [X] 1-4,7 * pages 7-8 *; | [X]US6716883 (CASPER ROBERT F [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10,11 * column 4, line 43; example 5; claim 1 *; | [X]DE202006008905U (FRITZ UWE [DE]) [X] 3,4,6,10,11 * paragraph [0018]; claim 9 *; | [XY]WO2007011674 (BAKER DONALD J [US]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 7, lines 4-11; claims 1,8,26 * * page 16, lines 3-6 * [Y] 10,11; | [X]US2007053851 (MAILLAN PHILIPPE E [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10,11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0090] *; | [XY]WO2008120220 (GOKARAJU GANGA RAJU [IN], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * claims 1,9,24 * [Y] 10,11; | [X]US2009087501 (CUMMINS DIANE [US]) [X] 1-4,6,10,11 * paragraphs [0010] , [0045] , [0050] *; | [X]WO2009144179 (SYMRISE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 3,4,8* page 5, paragraph 7 *; | [XP]WO2010120275 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [XP] 1-4,8,10,11 * page 43 *; | [XY] - LA V D ET AL, "Cranberry Proanthocyanidins Inhibit MMP Production and Activity", JOURNAL OF DENTAL RESEARCH, (200907), vol. 88, no. 7, ISSN 0022-0345, pages 627 - 632, XP002632489 [X] 3-5 * pages 627,630; figure 1 * [Y] 1,2,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0022034509339487 | [XY] - BODET C CHARLES ET AL, "Inhibition of periodontopathogen-derived proteolytic enzymes by a high-molecular-weight fraction isolated from cranberry", JOURNAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL CHEMOTHERAPY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, vol. 57, no. 4, doi:DOI:10.1093/JAC/DKL031, ISSN 0305-7453, (20060401), pages 685 - 690, (20060210), XP002506151 [X] 3-5 * page 686; figure 1 * [Y] 1,2,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/JAC/DKL031 | [XY] - BODET C ET AL, "Anti-inflammatory activity of a high-molecular-weight cranberry fraction on macrophages stimulated by lipopolysaccharides from periodontopathogens", JOURNAL OF DENTAL RESEARCH, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR DENTAL RESEARCH, US, (20060301), vol. 85, no. 3, doi:DOI:10.1177/154405910608500306, ISSN 0022-0345, pages 235 - 239, XP002566095 [X] 3-5 * pages 235-234; figure 2 * [Y] 1,2,10,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/154405910608500306 | [Y] - HERNÁNDEZ MARCELA ET AL, "MMP-13 and TIMP-1 determinations in progressive chronic periodontitis.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PERIODONTOLOGY SEP 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17716308, (200709), vol. 34, no. 9, ISSN 0303-6979, pages 729 - 735, XP009147155 [Y] 1,2 * page 732; figure 3 * | by applicant | - UITTO ET AL., AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOPHYSIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 152, no. 6, page 1489 | - ILGENLI, T. ET AL., ORAL DISEASES, (2006), vol. 12, page 573 | - WEISS E, LEV-DOR, R., KASHMAMN, Y., GOLDHAR, J., SHARON, N., OFEK, ITZHAK, J. AM. DENT. ASSOC., (1998), vol. 129, page 1719 | - SOLEAS ET AL., CLIN BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 30, pages 91 - 113 | - CASPER ET AL., MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (1999), vol. 56, pages 784 - 790 | - QIN, L. ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 278, no. 22, page 19723 | - WEISS ET AL., J. AM. DENT. ASSOC., (1998), vol. 129, no. 12, page 1719 | FR19980005673 |