EP2504056 - VALVED MALE LUER CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrie Borla S.p.A. Via G. Di Vittorio 7bis 10024 Moncalieri (Torino) / IT | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUALA, Gianni Strada Villa Zanetti 28/18 I-10133 Torino / IT | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Buzzi, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 10803506.4 | 25.11.2010 | WO2010IB55430 | Priority number, date | IT2009TO00921 | 26.11.2009 Original published format: IT TO20090921 | [2012/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011064738 | Date: | 03.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2504056 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2504056 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/26 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
A61M39/26 (EP,US);
A61M2039/267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MÄNNLICHER LUER VERBINDER MIT VENTIL | [2013/15] | English: | VALVED MALE LUER CONNECTOR | [2012/40] | French: | CONNECTEUR MÂLE TYPE LUER AVEC VALVE | [2013/15] |
Former [2012/40] | MÄNNLICHER LUER-STECKER MIT VENTIL | ||
Former [2012/40] | RACCORD LUER MÂLE AVEC VALVE | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/40] | 11.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2010 | AL | 28.08.2013 | AT | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | HR | 28.08.2013 | LT | 28.08.2013 | LV | 28.08.2013 | MK | 28.08.2013 | MT | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | SM | 28.08.2013 | LU | 25.11.2013 | NO | 28.11.2013 | RS | 28.11.2013 | IS | 28.12.2013 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.11.2010 | |
AL | 28.08.2013 | ||
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LU | 25.11.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
RS | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2018/46] | HU | 25.11.2010 | |
AL | 28.08.2013 | ||
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
LU | 25.11.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
RS | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 25.11.2010 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
LU | 25.11.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
RS | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 25.11.2010 | |
AT | 28.08.2013 | ||
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
LU | 25.11.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
RS | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 28.08.2013 | |
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 28.08.2013 | |
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 28.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003032940 (DOYLE MARK C [US]) [X] 1-7 * figures 9,10 *; | [A]WO2008057956 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2005151105 (RYAN DANA W [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]WO2009118417 (VYGON [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US7559530 (KOROGI TODD M [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 23,24 * | by applicant | US7559530 | EP1834665 |