EP2460401 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL SUSTAINABLE PLANT COVERAGE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad de Almería Otri - Edificio CAE Plta baja. Ctra. de Sacramento s/n La Cañada de San Urbano 04120 Almería / ES | For all designated states Burés Pastor, Silvia Calle Sant Gervasi de Cassoles 102 Escalera B,3° 3aª 08022 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states Universidad De Almería Otri - Edificio CAE Plta baja. Ctra. de Sacramento s/n La Cañada de San Urbano 04120 Almería / ES | ||
For all designated states Burés Pastor, Silvia Calle Sant Gervasi de Cassoles 102 Escalera B,3° 3aª 08022 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URRESTARAZU GAVILÁN, Miguel José Luis Sampedro 189 E-04008 Almería / ES | 02 /
BURÉS PASTOR, Silvia Calle Sant Gervase de Cassoles 102 escalera B, 3, 3aa 8022 Barcelona / ES | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 10803939.7 | 27.07.2010 | WO2010ES00360 | Priority number, date | ES20090001772 | 31.07.2009 Original published format: ES 200901772 | [2012/23] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011012748 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | ES | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2460401 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 03.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02, A01G1/00 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
A01G9/025 (EP);
A01G9/02 (ES);
A01G9/033 (EP);
Y02P60/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/23] | A01G9/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | DREIDIMENSIONALE NACHHALTIGE PFLANZENABDECKUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2012/23] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL SUSTAINABLE PLANT COVERAGE STRUCTURE | [2012/23] | French: | STRUCTURE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE DE COUVERTURE VÉGÉTALE DURABLE | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2012 | Translation filed | 29.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 18.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 23.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002034329 (DAIWA HOUSE IND); | [XA]DE202004000438U (BOYMANN BEGRUENUNGEN GMBH & CO [DE]); | [X]WO2007074579 (KYODO KY TEC CORP [JP], et al); | [X]FR2902602 (ETUDE ET RECH POLYTECHNIC DU V [FR]); | [X]US2008110086 (JULIA ARNOLD [FR]); | [XAI]ES2317293T (SOPREMA) | International search | [A]WO2005005747 (TRIBEL FRANCOIS [FR]); | [A]FR2902602 (ETUDE ET RECH POLYTECHNIC DU V [FR]); | [X]ES2317293T (SOPREMA) | by applicant | US5913790 | FR2857396 | US2006285920 | ES2300049T |