EP2459062 - NON-INVASIVE DEEP MUSCLE ELECTROMYOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Cape Town Lovers Walk Rondebosch Cape Town 7700 / ZA | For all designated states South African Medical Research Council Francie van Zijl Drive Parow Valley 7500 Cape Town / ZA | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHN, Lester, Ryan 403 St. Martini Gardens Queen Victoria Street Gardens 8001 Cape Town / ZA | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Margotti, Herwig Franz Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [2012/23] | Application number, filing date | 10803972.8 | 29.07.2010 | WO2010IB01876 | Priority number, date | ZA20090005309 | 30.07.2009 Original published format: ZA 200905309 | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011012988 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2459062 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0488, A61B5/00, A61B5/04 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
A61B5/7203 (EP,US);
A61B5/296 (EP,US);
A61B5/316 (EP,US);
A61B5/4519 (EP,US);
A61B2562/043 (EP,US);
A61B5/0536 (EP,US);
A61B5/1107 (US);
A61B5/389 (US);
A61B5/6802 (US);
A61B5/6824 (EP,US);
A61B5/6831 (EP,US);
A61B5/7264 (US);
G06F2218/22 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/23] | A61B5/0488 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | NICHTINVASIVE TIEFE MUSKELELEKTROMYOGRAPHIE | [2012/23] | English: | NON-INVASIVE DEEP MUSCLE ELECTROMYOGRAPHY | [2012/23] | French: | ÉLECTROMYOGRAPHIE NON EFFRACTIVE DE MUSCLE PROFOND | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 21.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.10.2020 | 20.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 24.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0195799 (NASA [US]) [A] 1* figures 1, 2 *; | [I]WO2004084087 (QINETIQ LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1,2,8 * figure 4 * * page 17, line 15 - page 18, line 6 *; | [I] - AZZERBONI B ET AL, "A New Approach to Detection of Muscle Activation by Independent Component Analysis and Wavelet Transform", SECURITY IN COMMUNICATION NETWORKS : THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ; REVISED PAPERS / SCN 2002, AMALFI, ITALY, SEPTEMBER 11 - 13, 2002; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE , ISSN 0302-9743], SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, (20020601), vol. 2486, doi:10.1007/3-540-45808-5_11, ISBN 978-3-540-24128-7, pages 109 - 116, XP002287268 [I] 1-8 * figures 3-7 * * sentence 6, paragraph 1 - sentence 13 * * sentence 1, paragraph 3 - sentence 12 * * sentence 1, paragraph 5 - sentence 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-45808-5_11 | [I] - HIDEO NAKAMURA ET AL, "The application of independent component analysis to the multi-channel surface electromyographic signals for separation of motor unit action potential trains: part I-measuring techniques", JOURNAL OF ELECTROMYOGRAPHY AND KINESIOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040801), vol. 14, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.jelekin.2004.01.004, ISSN 1050-6411, pages 423 - 432, XP055348941 [I] 1-8 * figure 5 * * page 424, column 1, line 26, paragraph 1 - line 31 * * page 424, column 1, line 11, paragraph 2 - line 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jelekin.2004.01.004 | [X] - STUART MCGILL ET AL, "Appropriately placed surface EMG electrodes reflect deep muscle activity (psoas, quadratus lumborum, abdominal wall) in the lumbar spine", JOURNAL OF BIOMECHANICS, PERGAMON PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 29, no. 11, doi:10.1016/0021-9290(96)84547-7, ISSN 0021-9290, (19961101), pages 1503 - 1507, (19990326), XP008148433 [X] 1,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9290(96)84547-7 | International search | [A]US6185451 (RICHARDSON CAROLYN ANNE [AU], et al); | [A]US2006189882 (THOMAS MATTHEW J [GB]); | [X] - MARTIN J.M. ET AL, "Non-invasive monitoring of functionally distinct muscle activations during swallowing", CLINICAL NEUROPHYSIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 113, pages 354 - 366, XP008148430 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1388-2457(02)00007-X | [X] - MCGILL S., "Appropriately placed surface emg electrodes reflect deep muscle activity (psoas, quadratus lumborum, abdominal wall) in the lumbar spine", JOURNAL OF BIOMECHANICS, (1996), vol. 29, no. 11, pages 1503 - 1507, XP008148433 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9290(96)84547-7 | [A] - AZZERBONI B. ET AL, "A New Approach to Detection of Muscle Activation by Independent Component Analysis and Wavelet Transform", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 2486, pages 109 - 116, XP002287268 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-45808-5_11 | [A] - BIEDERMANN F. ET AL, "Surface EMG-recordings using a miniaturised matrix electrode: a new technique for small animals", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE METHODS, (2000), vol. 97, pages 69 - 75, XP027285118 | by applicant | US6185451 | WO2004084087 | WO2004107976 | - JASPER R DAUBE; DEVON I RUBIN, "Needle electromyography", Muscle & Nerve, (20090000), vol. 39, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1002/mus.21180, pages 244 - 270, XP055348215 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mus.21180 | - MCGILL et al., J. Biomechanics, (19960000), vol. 29, no. 11, pages 1503 - 1507 | - JESINGER; STONIC, IEEE DSP Workshop Proc., (19940000), pages 57 - 60 | - VAN DEN DOEL et al., Inverse Problems, (20080000), vol. 24, pages 1 - 17 | - AZZERBONI B et al., A New Approach to Detection of Muscle3 Activation by Independent Component Analysis and Wavelet Transform, Springer Verlag, vol. 2486, pages 109 - 116 | - HIDEO NAKAMURA et al., "The application of independent component analysis to the multi-channel surface electromyographic signals for separation of motor unit action potential trains: part I - measuring techniques", Journal of Electromyography and kinesiology, (20040801), vol. 14, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jelekin.2004.01.004, pages 423 - 432, XP055348941 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jelekin.2004.01.004 | - KLEMM, MATTHIAS; JENS HAUEISEN; GALINA IVANOVA, "Independent component analysis: comparison of algorithms for the investigation of surface electrical brain activity", Medical & Biological Engineering & Computing, (20090400), vol. 47, no. 4, pages 413 - 423, XP019835355 |