EP2474530 - INDOLE DERIVATIVE AND PHARMACOLOGICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kissei Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 19-48, Yoshino Matsumoto-shi Nagano 399-8710 / JP | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Tatsuhiro c/o Central Research Laboratories Kissei Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 4365-1 Hotaka-Kashiwabara Azumino-shi Nagano 399-8304 / JP | 02 /
KONDO, Atsushi c/o Central Research Laboratories Kissei Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 4365-1 Hotaka-Kashiwabara Azumino-shi Nagano 399-8304 / JP | 03 /
TATANI, Kazuya c/o Central Research Laboratories Kissei Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 4365-1 Hotaka-Kashiwabara Azumino-shi Nagano 399-8304 / JP | 04 /
KAWAMURA, Naohiro c/o Central Research Laboratories Kissei Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 4365-1 Hotaka-Kashiwabara Azumino-shi Nagano 399-8304 / JP | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/23] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10804369.6 | 26.07.2010 | WO2010JP62532 | Priority number, date | JP20090173852 | 27.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009173852 | JP20090252846 | 04.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009252846 | [2012/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011013623 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2474530 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2474530 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/18, C07D401/04, C07D401/06, C07D401/14, C07D405/04, C07D405/06, C07D405/14, C07D409/04, C07D409/06, C07D409/14, C07D413/14, C07D417/06, C07D417/14, A61K31/404, A61K31/422, A61K31/427, A61K31/4439, A61P13/02, A61P43/00 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/422 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (KR);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D209/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/23] | C07D209/18, A61K31/404, A61K31/422, A61K31/427, A61K31/4439, A61P13/02, A61P43/00, C07D401/04, C07D401/06, C07D401/14, C07D405/04, C07D405/06, C07D405/14, C07D409/04, C07D409/06, C07D409/14, C07D413/14, C07D417/06, C07D417/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Extension states | BA | 24.02.2012 | ME | 24.02.2012 | RS | 24.02.2012 | Title | German: | INDOLDERIVAT UND PHARMAZEUTISCH AKZEPTABLES SALZ DARAUS | [2012/23] | English: | INDOLE DERIVATIVE AND PHARMACOLOGICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT THEREOF | [2012/23] | French: | DÉRIVÉ D'INDOLE ET SEL PHARMACOLOGIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLE DE CELUI-CI | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2012 | Translation filed | 24.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 12.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2010 | AL | 03.09.2014 | AT | 03.09.2014 | BE | 03.09.2014 | BG | 03.09.2014 | CY | 03.09.2014 | CZ | 03.09.2014 | DK | 03.09.2014 | EE | 03.09.2014 | ES | 03.09.2014 | FI | 03.09.2014 | HR | 03.09.2014 | IT | 03.09.2014 | LT | 03.09.2014 | LV | 03.09.2014 | MC | 03.09.2014 | MK | 03.09.2014 | MT | 03.09.2014 | NL | 03.09.2014 | PL | 03.09.2014 | RO | 03.09.2014 | SE | 03.09.2014 | SI | 03.09.2014 | SK | 03.09.2014 | SM | 03.09.2014 | TR | 03.09.2014 | NO | 03.12.2014 | GR | 04.12.2014 | IS | 03.01.2015 | PT | 05.01.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 26.07.2010 | |
AT | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MK | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
TR | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 26.07.2010 | |
AT | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
TR | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 03.09.2014 | |
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 03.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9851667 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-17* abstract *; | [AP]WO2009156462 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [AP] 1-17 * example 35; claims 1,16 * | International search | [A]US4510158 (BAILEY DENIS M [US]); | [A] - HALL, A. ET AL., "Discovery of a novel indole series of EP1 receptor antagonists by scaffold hopping", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2008), vol. 18, no. 8, pages 2684 - 2690, XP022606372 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.03.018 | by applicant | US4510158 | JP2008214224 | - NARIHITO SEKI, FOLIA PHARMACOLOGIA JAPONICA, (2007), vol. 129, pages 368 - 373 | - XIAOJUN WANG ET AL., BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, (2008), vol. 29, pages 105 - 111 | - MASAHITO KAWATANI, PAIN RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 19, pages 185 - 190 | - MASANOBU MAEGAWA, THE JOURNAL OF THE JAPAN NEUROGENIC BLADDER SOCIETY, (2008), vol. 19, page 169 | - ADRIAN HALL ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2008), pages 2684 - 2690 |