EP2509824 - LUMINOUS CONTROL BUTTON ON A CONTROL PANEL OF A MOTOR VEHICLE INSTRUMENT PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 8 Rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis / FR | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THORAILLER, Maryline 41 rue Voltaire F-94490 Ormesson Sur Marne / FR | 02 /
BERAUD, Henry 138 rue de la Jarry F-94300 Vincennes / FR | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Pothmann, Karsten Valeo Etudes Electroniques Service Propriété Industrielle 76 rue Auguste Perret - ZI Europarc 94046 Creteil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Pothmann, Karsten Valeo Etudes Electroniques Service Propriété Industrielle 76 rue Auguste Perret - ZI Europarc 94046 Creteil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2012/42] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10805442.0 | 08.12.2010 | WO2010FR00825 | Priority number, date | FR20090005931 | 08.12.2009 Original published format: FR 0905931 | [2012/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011070255 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2509824 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q3/00, B60Q3/04, B60K35/00, B60K37/06, H01H9/18, B60H1/00, G02B6/00, H01H13/02 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
B60H1/0065 (EP);
B60Q3/14 (EP);
B60Q3/64 (EP);
H01H13/023 (EP);
H01H9/182 (EP);
H01H2013/026 (EP);
H01H2219/03 (EP);
H01H2219/062 (EP);
H01H2219/0622 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | LEUCHTENDER STEUERKNOPF AUF DEM STEUERFELD EINES ARMATURENBRETTS EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2012/42] | English: | LUMINOUS CONTROL BUTTON ON A CONTROL PANEL OF A MOTOR VEHICLE INSTRUMENT PANEL | [2012/42] | French: | BOUTON DE COMMANDE LUMINEUX D'UNE FAÇADE DE COMMANDE D'UN TABLEAU DE BORD DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 18.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/48] | 16.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3133134 (RAU SWF AUTOZUBEHOER [DE]); | [A]US4549050 (LANG PAUL R [US]); | [A]US4778966 (OBATA KOSEI [JP], et al); | [X]DE4026290 (SWF AUTO ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE19738666 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) |