EP2463286 - BENZYL PIPERIDINE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8524 / JP | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOYODA, Tomohiro c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co. Ltd. 33-94, Enoki-cho Suita-shi Osaka 564-0053 / JP | 02 /
NISHIDA, Tomoaki c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co. Ltd. 1-98, Kasugadenaka 3-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0022 / JP | 03 /
YOSHINAGA Hidefumi c/o Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co. Ltd. 33-94, Enoki-cho Suita-shi Osaka 564-0053 / JP | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/24] | Application number, filing date | 10806467.6 | 04.08.2010 | WO2010JP63148 | Priority number, date | JP20090181550 | 04.08.2009 Original published format: JP 2009181550 | [2012/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011016468 | Date: | 10.02.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2463286 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/06, A61K31/453, A61P25/22, A61P25/24, A61P43/00 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
C07D405/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/453 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D311/22 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | BENZYLPIPERIDINVERBINDUNG | [2012/24] | English: | BENZYL PIPERIDINE COMPOUND | [2012/24] | French: | COMPOSÉ DE BENZYLPIPÉRIDINE | [2012/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2012 | Translation filed | 16.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 11.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/08] | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1304324 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 52, paragraph 0275; examples 278-285 * * Markush formula of claim 1 with R0= OH, substituted alkoxy, n=2, R3=H, Y=ethylene with R5, R6 =H and m=2, Z= substituted aromatic heterocyclic group * * Use as serotonin reuptake inhibitor to treat anxiety disorders, depression and other neurological diseases :; page 17, paragraph 0083; claims 2-8 *; | [E]EP2239254 (DAINIPPON SUMITOMO PHARMA CO [JP]) [E] 1-15 * examples 3-5 * * examples 7, 10, 13, 17, 20; table 1 * * examples 21, 23, 24 * * Use as serotonin reuptake inhibitor to treat anxiety disorders and depression :;; claims 9-10 *; | [P]WO2009099087 (DAINIPPON SUMITOMO PHARMA CO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP2000500773 (WARNER-LAMBERT CO.); | [A]WO0206231 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP], et al); | [A]WO03053928 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP], et al); | [AP]WO2009099087 (DAINIPPON SUMITOMO PHARMA CO [JP], et al) |