EP2461969 - CONTAINER HAVING A FOAMED WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastic Technologies, Inc. 1440 Timberwolf Drive Holland, OH 43528-0964 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Plastic Technologies, Inc. 1440 Timberwolf Drive Holland, OH 43528 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEMERSKY, Frank, E. 7944 Hidden Harbour Drive East Holland OH 43528 / US | 02 /
VOYLES, William, D. 5823 Acoma Drive Toledo OH 43623 / US | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 47-50 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10806861.0 | 26.07.2010 | WO2010US43227 | Priority number, date | US20090536768 | 06.08.2009 Original published format: US 536768 | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011017048 | Date: | 10.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2461969 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B32B1/02, B29C45/16 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
B29C44/08 (EP,US);
B65D1/0207 (EP,US);
B29B11/08 (EP,US);
B29B11/14 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0822 (EP,US);
B29C2035/1658 (EP,US);
B29C2045/1722 (EP,US);
B29C2049/023 (EP);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/0773 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0872 (EP,US);
B29C2949/22 (EP,US);
B29C2949/24 (EP,US);
B29C2949/26 (EP,US);
B29C2949/28 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3008 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3012 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3016 (EP,US);
B29C2949/302 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3024 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3026 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3028 (EP,US);
B29C2949/303 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3032 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3034 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3036 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3038 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3042 (EP,US);
B29C35/045 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/071 (EP);
B29C49/6427 (EP);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/04 (EP,US);
B29K2105/045 (EP,US);
B29K2105/258 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0067 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7158 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1376 (EP,US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249981 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | CONTAINER MIT SCHAUMSTOFFWAND | [2012/24] | English: | CONTAINER HAVING A FOAMED WALL | [2012/24] | French: | RÉCIPIENT DOTÉ D UNE PAROI EXPANSÉE | [2012/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 11.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3419455 (ROBERTS ARTHUR H); | [Y]US2004086703 (SEMERSKY FRANK E [US]); | [Y]US2006073298 (HUTCHINSON GERALD A [US], et al); | [Y]US2009026198 (ICHIKAWA KENTAROU [JP], et al); | [YE]US2009297748 (SEMERSKY FRANK E [US], et al); | [YE]US2010000957 (HUTCHINSON GERALD A [US], et al) |