EP2459573 - SUBSTITUTED 1,2-AZABORINE HETEROCYCLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states State of Oregon acting by & through the State Board of Higher Eduction on behalf of the University of Oregon 1238 University of Oregon Eugene, OR 97403-1238 / US | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Shih-Yuan Department of Chemistry 1253 University Of Oregon Eugene, OR 97403-1253 / US | 02 /
MARWITZ, Adam Department of Chemistry 1253 University Of Oregon Eugene, OR 97403-1253 / US | 03 /
ABBEY, Eric Department of Chemistry 1253 University Of Oregon Eugene, OR 97403-1253 / US | 04 /
LAMM, Ashley Department of Chemistry 1253 University Of Oregon Eugene, OR 97403-1253 / US | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Selby, David Sean, et al HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Selby, David Sean, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2012/23] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10806908.9 | 27.07.2010 | WO2010US43444 | Priority number, date | US20090228883P | 27.07.2009 Original published format: US 228883 P | US20090228893P | 27.07.2009 Original published format: US 228893 P | US20100301475P | 04.02.2010 Original published format: US 301475 P | US20100348673P | 26.05.2010 Original published format: US 348673 P | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011017129 | Date: | 10.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2459573 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07F3/02 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
C07F5/02 (EP,GB,KR,US);
C07B61/00 (KR);
C08F130/06 (GB);
C08G73/02 (KR);
C08G79/08 (GB);
Y02E60/36 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE 1,2-AZABORIN-HETEROZYKLEN | [2012/23] | English: | SUBSTITUTED 1,2-AZABORINE HETEROCYCLES | [2012/23] | French: | HÉTÉROCYCLES DE 1,2-AZABORINE SUBSTITUÉS | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 21.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2010135519 (UNIVERSAL DISPLAY CORP [US], et al) |