EP2464723 - METHOD FOR INDUCING DIFFERENTIATION OF PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS INTO NEURAL PRECURSOR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2012/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Jun c/o Institute for Frontier Medical Sciences Kyoto University 53 Kawahara-cho Shogoin, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8507 / JP | 02 /
MORIZANE, Asuka c/o Institute for Frontier Medical Sciences Kyoto University 53 Kawahara-cho Shogoin, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8507 / JP | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2012/25] | Dempster, Robert Charles, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10808270.2 | 12.08.2010 | [2016/25] | WO2010JP63953 | Priority number, date | US20090272055P | 12.08.2009 Original published format: US 272055 P | US20100282970P | 30.04.2010 Original published format: US 282970 P | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011019092 | Date: | 17.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2464723 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2464723 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/07 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
C12N5/0618 (EP,US);
C12N2501/155 (EP,US);
C12N2506/02 (EP,US);
C12N2506/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERBEIFÜHRUNG DER DIFFERENZIERUNG PLURIPOTENTER STAMMZELLEN IN NERVENVORLÄUFERZELLEN | [2012/25] | English: | METHOD FOR INDUCING DIFFERENTIATION OF PLURIPOTENT STEM CELLS INTO NEURAL PRECURSOR CELLS | [2012/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INDUCTION D'UNE DIFFÉRENCIATION DE CELLULES SOUCHES PLURIPOTENTES EN CELLULES PRÉCURSEURS NEURALES | [2012/25] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 24.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2010 | AL | 22.06.2016 | AT | 22.06.2016 | BE | 22.06.2016 | BG | 22.06.2016 | CY | 22.06.2016 | CZ | 22.06.2016 | DK | 22.06.2016 | EE | 22.06.2016 | FI | 22.06.2016 | HR | 22.06.2016 | LT | 22.06.2016 | LV | 22.06.2016 | MC | 22.06.2016 | MK | 22.06.2016 | PL | 22.06.2016 | RO | 22.06.2016 | SE | 22.06.2016 | SI | 22.06.2016 | SK | 22.06.2016 | SM | 22.06.2016 | IE | 12.08.2016 | LU | 12.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | NO | 22.09.2016 | GR | 23.09.2016 | IS | 22.10.2016 | PT | 24.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 12.08.2010 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
IE | 12.08.2016 | ||
LU | 12.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/34] | HU | 12.08.2010 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
IE | 12.08.2016 | ||
LU | 12.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.08.2010 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
IE | 12.08.2016 | ||
LU | 12.08.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
IE | 12.08.2016 | ||
LU | 12.08.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 22.06.2016 | |
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 22.06.2016 | |
NO | 22.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2010063848 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [XP] 1-3,5,8-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2008056166 (CAMBRIDGE ENTPR LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 2,3,5,6,8 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2010144696 (BURNHAM INST MEDICAL RESEARCH [US], et al) [E] 1-10 * the whole document * | [X] - SHUNMEI CHIBA ET AL, "Noggin Enhances Dopamine Neuron Production from Human Embryonic Stem Cells and Improves Behavioral Outcome After Transplantation into Parkinsonian Rats", STEM CELLS, (20081101), vol. 26, no. 11, doi:10.1634/stemcells.2008-0085, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 2810 - 2820, XP055072512 [X] 1,3,4,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2008-0085 | [X] - RYO HOTTA ET AL, "Small Molecule Induction of Neural Crest-like Cells Derived from Human Neural Progenitors", STEM CELLS, (20090101), doi:10.1002/stem.208, ISSN 1066-5099, pages N/A - N/A, XP055072509 [X] 1,3,4,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/stem.208 | [Y] - FINLEY M F A ET AL, "BMP-4 INHIBITS NEURAL DIFFERENTIATION OF MURINE EMBRYONIC STEM CELLS", JOURNAL OF NEUROBIOLOGY, JOHN WILEY AND SONS., NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990905), vol. 40, no. 3, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-4695(19990905)40:3<271::AID-NEU1>3.0.CO;2-C, ISSN 0022-3034, pages 271 - 287, XP009017895 [Y] 1,3,5,6,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4695(19990905)40:3<271::AID-NEU1>3.0.CO;2-C | [Y] - PERA M F ET AL, "REGULATION OF HUMAN EMBRYONIC STEM CELL DIFFERENTIATION BY BMP-2 AND ITS ANTAGONIST NOGGIN", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, LONDON, GB, (20040401), vol. 117, no. PART 07, doi:10.1242/JCS.00970, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 1269 - 1280, XP009030261 [Y] 1,3,5,6,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.00970 | [Y] - SMITH J R ET AL, "Inhibition of Activin/Nodal signaling promotes specification of human embryonic stem cells into neuroectoderm", DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 313, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.YDBIO.2007.10.003, ISSN 0012-1606, (20080101), pages 107 - 117, (20071011), XP025612042 [Y] 2,3,5,8,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ydbio.2007.10.003 | [YP] - RICKIE PATANI ET AL, "Activin/Nodal Inhibition Alone Accelerates Highly Efficient Neural Conversion from Human Embryonic Stem Cells and Imposes a Caudal Positional Identity", PLOS ONE, (20091006), vol. 4, no. 10, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0007327, page e7327, XP055072252 [YP] 2,3,5,8,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0007327 | [T] - ASUKA MORIZANE ET AL, "Small-molecule inhibitors of bone morphogenic protein and activin/nodal signals promote highly efficient neural induction from human pluripotent stem cells", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, (20101208), vol. 89, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jnr.22547, ISSN 0360-4012, pages 117 - 126, XP055072280 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jnr.22547 | International search | [X]WO2005123902 (RIKEN [JP], et al); | [X]JP2004533835 (GERON CORPORATION); | [A]JP2008099662 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO); | [T]WO2010096496 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US], et al); | [T]WO2010108005 (UNIV GEORGIA RES FOUND [US], et al); | [T]WO2010108008 (UNIV GEORGIA RES FOUND [US], et al) | [Y] - CHAMBERS SM ET AL., "Highly efficient neural conversion of human ES and iPS cells by dual inhibition of SMAD signaling.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200903), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 275 - 280, XP055007827 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1529 | [Y] - YU PB ET AL., "BMP type I receptor inhibition reduces heterotopic ossification.", NAT MED., (2008), vol. 14, no. 12, pages 1363 - 1369, XP008152158 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.1888 | [Y] - HAO J ET AL., "Dorsomorphin, a selective small molecule inhibitor of BMP signaling, promotes cardiomyogenesis in embryonic stem cells.", PLOS ONE, (2008), vol. 3, no. 8, page E2904, XP007914401 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0002904 | [Y] - TOJO M ET AL., "The ALK-5 inhibitor A-83-01 inhibits Smad signaling and epithelial-to-mesenchymal transition by transforming growth factor-a.", CANCER SCI., (2005), vol. 96, no. 11, pages 791 - 800, XP008145321 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1349-7006.2005.00103.x | [A] - SMITH JR ET AL., "Inhibition of Activin/Nodal signaling promotes specification of human embryonic stem cells into neuroectoderm.", DEV BIOL., (2008), vol. 313, no. 1, pages 107 - 117, XP025612042 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ydbio.2007.10.003 | [XP] - KIM DS ET AL., "Robust enhancement of neural differentiation from Human ES and iPS cells regardless of their innate difference in differentiation propensity.", STEM CELL REVIEWS AND REPORTS., (201004), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 270 - 281, XP055007831 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12015-010-9138-1 | [XP] - HONDA M ET AL., "A cellular model of Alzheimer's disease produced by genetical modification and neural differentiation of human embryonic stem cell lines.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE., (201001), vol. 232, no. 2, pages 123 - 127, XP008153474 | [XP] - WADA T ET AL., "Highly efficient differentiation and enrichment of spinal motor neurons derived from human and monkey embryonic stem cells.", PLOS ONE, (20090824), vol. 4, no. 8, page E6722 | by applicant | US5843780 | WO2007069666 | WO2008033408 | WO2005123902 | - WATANABE K ET AL., NAT NEUROSCI., (2005), vol. 8, pages 288 - 96 | - KAWASAKI H ET AL., NEURON, (2000), vol. 28, pages 31 - 40 | - CHAMBERS SM ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL., (2009), vol. 27, pages 275 - 80 | - M. J. EVANS; M. H. KAUFMAN, NATURE, (1981), vol. 292, pages 154 - 156 | - J. A. THOMSON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 282, pages 1145 - 1147 | - J.A. THOMSON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1995), vol. 92, pages 7844 - 7848 | - J. A. THOMSON ET AL., BIOL. REPROD., (1996), vol. 55, pages 254 - 259 | - J. A. THOMSON; V. S. MARSHALL, CURR. TOP. DEV. BIOL., (1998), vol. 38, pages 133 - 165 | - H. SUEMORI ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2006), vol. 345, pages 926 - 932 | - M. UENO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2006), vol. 103, pages 9554 - 9559 | - H. SUEMORI ET AL., DEV. DYN., (2001), vol. 222, pages 273 - 279 | - H. KAWASAKI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2002), vol. 99, pages 1580 - 1585 | - E. KROON ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2008), vol. 26, pages 443 - 452 | - M. KANATSU-SHINOHARA ET AL., BIOL. REPROD., (2003), vol. 69, pages 612 - 616 | - K. SHINOHARA ET AL., CELL, (2004), vol. 119, pages 1001 - 1012 | - MASANORI TAKEBAYASHI ET AL., Experimental Medicine, YODOSHA, (2008), vol. 26, pages 41 - 46 | - Y. MATSUI ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 70, pages 841 - 847 | - J.L. RESNICK ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 359, pages 550 - 551 | - T. WAKAYAMA ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 292, pages 740 - 743 | - S. WAKAYAMA ET AL., BIOL. REPROD., (2005), vol. 72, pages 932 - 936 | - J. BYRNE ET AL., NATURE, (2007), vol. 450, pages 497 - 502 | - J. B. CIBELLI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1998), vol. 16, pages 642 - 646 | - KIYOKA WAKAYAMA ET AL., EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (2008), vol. 26, no. 5, pages 47 - 52 | - P. B. YU ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2007), vol. 116 | - P.B. YU ET AL., NAT. CHEM. BIOL., (2008), vol. 4, pages 33 - 41 | - J. HAO ET AL., PLOS ONE, vol. 3, no. 8, (2008), page E2904, URL: www. plozone. org | - YU PB ET AL., NAT MED, (2008), vol. 14, pages 1363 - 9 | - EXP HEMATOL., (1989), vol. 17, pages 145 - 53 | - SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 265, pages 1098 - 1101 | - CHAMBERS SM ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL., (2009), vol. 27, page 485 | - KAWASAKI H ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U.S.A., (2002), vol. 99, pages 1580 - 5 | - NATURE NEUROSCIENCE, (1999), vol. 2, page 1137 | - N ENGL J MED., (2001), vol. 344, pages 710 - 9 | - SUEMORI H ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (2006), vol. 345, pages 926 - 32 | - TAKAHASHI K ET AL., CELL, (2007), vol. 131, pages 861 - 72 | - NAKAGAWA M ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL., (2008), vol. 26, pages 101 - 6 | US20090232402 | US20100307306 |