EP2465073 - OPTIMIZING WELL MANAGEMENT POLICY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Upstream Research Company 3120 Buffalo Speedway Houston, TX 77098-2189 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states Exxonmobil Upstream Research Company 3120 Buffalo Speedway Houston, TX 77098-2189 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIDSON, Jeffrey, E. 3103 Flatwood Ct. Pearland TX 77584 / US | 02 /
CARVALLO, Federico 403 Easton Bend Ct. Sugar Land TX 77479 / US | 03 /
McZEAL, Cassandra 6500-A Calder Houston TX 77007 / US | 04 /
LU, Pengbo 6803 Catesby Place Sugar Land TX 77479 / US | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. I.P. Law Shared Services P.O. Box 105 Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 10808473.2 | 12.05.2010 | WO2010US34560 | Priority number, date | US20090233362P | 12.08.2009 Original published format: US 233362 P | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011019421 | Date: | 17.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2465073 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06G7/48, E21B43/00, G06Q10/06 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
E21B43/00 (EP,US);
G06Q10/04 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06375 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/25] | G06G7/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTE RICHTLINIEN FÜR BOHRLOCHMANAGEMENT | [2012/25] | English: | OPTIMIZING WELL MANAGEMENT POLICY | [2012/25] | French: | OPTIMISATION DE POLITIQUE DE GESTION DE PUITS | [2012/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 09.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1441238 (PAVILION TECH INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0097] * * claim 28 * * figures 5,6 *; | [A]US2004254734 (ZABALZA-MEZGHANI ISABELLE [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077] * * claim 1 *; | [AD]WO2007001604 (EXXONMOBIL UPSTREAM RES CO [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]US7379853 (MIDDYA USUF [US]) [AD] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 2, line 21 - line 33 * * column 4, line 38 - line 67 * * column 6, line 22 - line 34 * * column 8, line 21 - line 53 * * claims 1-5 *; | [A]US2008162100 (LANDA JORGE L [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0068] * * claim 1 *; | [A]GB2395315 (SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS [VG]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3, line 12 - line 20 * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]US6236894 (STOISITS RICHARD F [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 4, line 16 - line 45 * * column 5, line 1 - line 24 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2007282582 (SAAF FREDRIK E [NL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2007282582 (SAAF FREDRIK E [NL]); | [Y]US2005209866 (VEENINGEN DAAN [US], et al); | [A]US2002100584 (COUET BENOIT [US], et al); | [A]US2006184329 (ROWAN DAVID [GB], et al); | [A]US2005228905 (VEENINGEN DAAN [US], et al); | [A]US6101447 (POE JR BOBBY DALE [US]); | [A]US7548840 (SAAF FREDRIK E [NL]) |