EP2464553 - UTILITY SCALE ELECTRIC ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Rail Energy Storage, LLC 999 Third Avenue Suite 4400 Seattle, WA 9814 / US | [2012/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEITZKE, William, R. 620 Lilac Drive Montecito CA 93108 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Matthew, B. 4621 Pescadero Ave. San Diego CA 92107 / US | 03 /
ERDMAN, William, L. 103 Sanders Ranch Rd. Moraga CA 94556 / US | 04 /
SCOTT, Robert, T. 1204 Callaway Dr. N Shorewood IL 60404 / US | 05 /
MOORHEAD, William, H. P.O. Box 922 Smithfield VA 3431 / US | 06 /
BLODGETT, Douglas, C. 4083 Walnut Drive Pleasanton CA 94566 / US | 07 /
SCOTT, David, I. 862 St. Andrews Way Frankfort IL 60423 / US | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2020/19] |
Former [2012/25] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10808567.1 | 08.08.2010 | [2020/19] | WO2010US44819 | Priority number, date | US20090233052P | 11.08.2009 Original published format: US 233052 P | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011019624 | Date: | 17.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2464553 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2464553 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B61C3/00 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
B60L7/10 (EP,KR,US);
B61C17/06 (EP,KR,US);
B60L55/00 (EP,KR,US);
B61C3/00 (EP,US);
B61C3/02 (KR);
H02J15/00 (KR);
B60L2200/26 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2210/30 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2210/40 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2220/14 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (US);
Y02T10/70 (US);
Y02T10/7072 (KR,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
Y02T10/92 (KR,US);
Y02T30/00 (US);
Y02T90/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | 12.03.2012 | ME | 12.03.2012 | RS | 12.03.2012 | Title | German: | INDUSTRIELLES STROMSPEICHERSYSTEM | [2012/25] | English: | UTILITY SCALE ELECTRIC ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM | [2012/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE D ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE COMMERCIAL | [2012/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 17.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2010 | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IE | 08.08.2020 | LU | 08.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.08.2010 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IE | 08.08.2020 | ||
LU | 08.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IE | 08.08.2020 | ||
LU | 08.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IE | 08.08.2020 | ||
LU | 08.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
LU | 08.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
LU | 08.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
LU | 08.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4858513 (KEMEMY GEORGE A [US]); | [Y]US5642270 (GREEN ROSS MARTIN [GB], et al); | [Y]US2005173601 (HESTAND LARRY D [US]); | [Y]US2005279242 (MAIER JAMES E [CA], et al); | [Y]US7231877 (KUMAR AJITH KUTTANNAIR [US]); | [Y]US2007272116 (BARTLEY THOMAS LEE [US], et al); | [A]US2008021602 (KINGHAM JOHN R [US], et al); | [A]US7430967 (KUMAR AJITH KUTTANNAIR [US]) | by applicant | US2007272116 |