EP2467955 - IN-BAND OPTICAL NOISE MEASUREMENT USING DIFFERENTIAL POLARIZATION RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXFO Inc. 400 Avenue Godin Québec, QC G1M 2K2 / CA | [2018/51] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Exfo Inc. 400 Avenue Godin Québec, Québec G1M 2K2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Gang 1184 rue Jean-Carignan Québec Québec G1X 4V4 / CA | 02 /
CYR, Normand apt. 410 1017 avenue Duchesneau Québec Québec G1W 4B3 / CA | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg SO Square Opéra 5,rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/26] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg 10, boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10809409.5 | 19.08.2010 | [2019/03] | WO2010CA01285 | Priority number, date | US20090235169P | 19.08.2009 Original published format: US 235169 P | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011020195 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467955 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2467955 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 24.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/07 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
H04B10/07953 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | H04B10/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BANDINTERNE OPTISCHE RAUSCHMESSUNG MITHILFE VERSCHIEDENER POLARISATIONSREAKTIONEN | [2012/26] | English: | IN-BAND OPTICAL NOISE MEASUREMENT USING DIFFERENTIAL POLARIZATION RESPONSE | [2012/26] | French: | MESURE DE BRUIT OPTIQUE DANS LA BANDE À L'AIDE D'UNE RÉPONSE DE POLARISATION DIFFÉRENTIELLE | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 24.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2010 | AL | 16.01.2019 | AT | 16.01.2019 | CY | 16.01.2019 | CZ | 16.01.2019 | DK | 16.01.2019 | EE | 16.01.2019 | ES | 16.01.2019 | FI | 16.01.2019 | HR | 16.01.2019 | IT | 16.01.2019 | LT | 16.01.2019 | LV | 16.01.2019 | MC | 16.01.2019 | MK | 16.01.2019 | MT | 16.01.2019 | NL | 16.01.2019 | PL | 16.01.2019 | RO | 16.01.2019 | SE | 16.01.2019 | SI | 16.01.2019 | SK | 16.01.2019 | SM | 16.01.2019 | TR | 16.01.2019 | BG | 16.04.2019 | NO | 16.04.2019 | GR | 17.04.2019 | IS | 16.05.2019 | PT | 16.05.2019 | IE | 19.08.2019 | LU | 19.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AL | 16.01.2019 | ||
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
MT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.08.2010 | |
AL | 16.01.2019 | ||
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
IE | 19.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 19.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 16.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2006051087 (MARTIN JURGEN [DE], et al); | [A]US7106443 (WEIN STEVEN J [US], et al); | [A]US7149407 (DOERR CHRISTOPHER [US], et al); | [A]US7149428 (CHUNG YUN CHUR [KR], et al); | [A]US2008124076 (RUDOLPH GEORG [DE], et al); | [A]US2008205886 (ANDERSON TREVOR [AU], et al); | [X]WO2008122123 (EXFO ELECTRO OPTICAL ENG INC [CA], et al); | [A]WO2009062237 (NAT ICT AUSTRALIA LTD [AU], et al); | [A] - HE, G. ET AL., "Measuring the In-Band Signal-to-Noise Ratio Within Narrow Optical Channels", TECHNICAL NOTE 038, (200904), URL: http://documents.exfo.com/appnotes/inote038-ang.pdf, XP008150130 | [A] - GARIEPY, D. ET AL., "Measuring OSNR in WDM Systems-Effects of Resolution Bandwidth and Optical Rejection Ratio", APPLICATION NOTE 098, (200904), URL: http://documents.eafo.com/appnotes/anote098-ang.pdf, XP008150132 | [A] - MOENCH, W. ET AL., "Measuring the Optical Signal-to-Noise Ratio in Agile Optical Networks", OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION AND THE NATIONAL FIBER OPTIC ENGINEERS CONFERENCE, OFC/NFOEC 2007, ANAHEIM, CA, (20070325), XP031146496 | [A] - TIAN, X. ET AL., "Precise In-Band OSNR and Spectrum Monitoring Using High-Resolution Swept Coherent Detection", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (20060101), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 145 - 147, XP008150133 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2005.859185 | [A] - SKOLD, M. ET AL., "PMD-Insensitive DOP-based OSNR Monitoring by Spectral SOP Measurements", TECHNICAL DIGEST OF OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE OFC/NFOEC 2005, (20050306), vol. 4, pages 6 - 11, XP010831884 | [A] - PETERSSON, M. ET AL., "Multi-Channel OSNR Monitoring for WDM Networks", 28TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION ECOC 2002, COPENHAGEN, (20020908), XP001158311 | [A] - BAKAUL, M., "Low-Cost PMD-Insensitive and Dispersion Tolerant In-Band OSNR Monitor Based on Uncorrelated Beat Noise Measurement", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (20080601), vol. 20, no. 11, pages 906 - 908, XP011214464 |