EP2467892 - FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mioxide Mining (Pty) Ltd Corner Osborne and Tedstone Streets Wadeville, Gauteng / ZA | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Human, Jan Petrus 15 Lobella Street 7130 Somerset West / ZA | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Baldwin, Mark, et al Firebird IP 27 Old Gloucester Street London WC1N 3AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Baldwin, Mark, et al Firebird IP 40 Bowling Green Lane London EC1R 0NE / GB | Application number, filing date | 10809609.0 | 16.08.2010 | WO2010IB53688 | Priority number, date | ZA20090005685 | 17.08.2009 Original published format: ZA 200905685 | ZA20090009200 | 23.12.2009 Original published format: ZA 200909200 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011021141 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467892 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/06, H01M16/00, C25B1/06, // H01M2/14, H01M8/08 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
C25B9/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/006 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/241 (KR,US);
C25B1/04 (EP,US);
C25B11/00 (EP,US);
C25B9/17 (EP,US);
C25B9/65 (EP,US);
H01M10/0413 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0422 (EP,KR,US);
H01M12/02 (KR);
H01M8/004 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0263 (EP);
H01M8/0656 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/10 (EP,US);
H01M8/1004 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/1009 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/188 (EP,US);
H01M8/20 (EP,US);
H01M8/2455 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/2465 (EP,KR);
H01M8/2475 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/2483 (KR,US);
H01M8/249 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | H01M8/06, H01M2/14, H01M8/08, H01M8/10, H01M8/20, H01M10/04, H01M12/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2012/26] | English: | FUEL CELL | [2012/26] | French: | PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 08.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 23.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.06.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.06.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08314372 (KAMIYA NOBUYUKI, et al) [X] 1,3,4,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0019] *; | [X]US5712054 (KEJHA JOSEPH B [US]) [X] 1,3,4,13 * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2854278 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-4* figure 1 *; | [X]JP2008047453 (NIDAI SEIKO KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [XP]FR2937478 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [XP] 1-4,13 * page 16, line 22 - page 18, line 13; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US2006194086 (HSU KUAI-TENG [US]); | [X]EP1806802 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [A]EP1508932 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]) |