EP2468229 - MESH UNDERPANTS AND METHOD OF PUTTING ON SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinesei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDO, Hiroko c/o Technical Center Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7 Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
FUJIOKA, Yoshihisa c/o Technical Center Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7 Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Knights, Rupert Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Knights, Rupert Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10809838.5 | 02.08.2010 | WO2010JP62997 | Priority number, date | JP20090190291 | 19.08.2009 Original published format: JP 2009190291 | [2012/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011021493 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2468229 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A41B9/02 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
A61F13/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | NETZUNTERHOSEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANZIEHEN DERSELBEN | [2012/26] | English: | MESH UNDERPANTS AND METHOD OF PUTTING ON SAME | [2012/26] | French: | SLIPS EN MAILLE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LES ENFILER | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2012 | Translation filed | 07.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 02.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5671615 (KJ RGAARD FINN [DK], et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]WO02087367 (BECH TORBEN [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2009003485 (TYTEX AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figure -; claim - * | International search | [Y]JPS54113633U (HONSHU HAIRAIFU KABUSHIKI KAISHA); | [Y]JPH0537219U (UNI-CHARM CORP.); | [Y]JP2008302009 (KAO CORP); | [Y]JPH08509400 (TYTEX A/S); | [A]JP2008541867 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.); | [A]JPH0375727U (KAZUKO SUZUKI); | [A]JPS6025702U (YUGEN KAISHA TSUKAHARA) | by applicant | JP2006144164 |