EP2467382 - AMINO TETRAHYDRO-PYRIDOPYRIMIDINE PDE10 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2014/26] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRESLIN, Michael, J. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 02 /
COLEMAN, Paul, J. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 03 /
COX, Christopher, D. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 04 /
RAHEEM, Izzat, T. Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 05 /
SCHREIER, John, D. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point Pennsylvania 19486 / US | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10810373.0 | 05.08.2010 | WO2010US44482 | Priority number, date | US20090234427P | 17.08.2009 Original published format: US 234427 P | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011022213 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467382 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2467382 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/519, A61P25/00 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D519/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | C07D471/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMINO-TETRAHYDRO-PYRIDOPYRIMIDIN-PDE10-HEMMER | [2012/26] | English: | AMINO TETRAHYDRO-PYRIDOPYRIMIDINE PDE10 INHIBITORS | [2012/26] | French: | AMINO-TÉTRAHYDRO-PYRIDOPYRIMIDINE INHIBITEURS DE PDE10 | [2014/02] |
Former [2012/26] | INHIBITEURS DE PDE10 D AMINO-TÉTRAHYDRO-PYRIDOPYRIMIDINE | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 18.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2010 | AL | 25.06.2014 | AT | 25.06.2014 | BE | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | ES | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | HR | 25.06.2014 | IT | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | MK | 25.06.2014 | MT | 25.06.2014 | NL | 25.06.2014 | PL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | SM | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | IE | 05.08.2014 | LU | 05.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | NO | 25.09.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | DE | 03.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 05.08.2010 | |
AT | 25.06.2014 | ||
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MK | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
TR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 05.08.2010 | |
AT | 25.06.2014 | ||
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
TR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.08.2010 | |
AT | 25.06.2014 | ||
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.08.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
DE | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1552842 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,12,13 * page 39 - page 48; table 4; compounds 4-15, 4-16, 4-27, 4-28, 4-110, 4-112, 4-115, 4-116 * * page 48 - page 49; table 4; compounds 4-117, 4-120, 4-122, 4-124, 4-127, 4-128, 4-129 * * page 49 - page 57; table 4; compounds 4-132, 4-207, 4-209, 4-219, 4-221 *; | [X]WO03076427 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,5-9,12,13 * page 219; example 91 *; | [X]US3248395 (GERHARD OHNACKER) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,12,13 * column 10 - column 21; examples 24, 25, 44, 45, 46, 66, 67, 68 * * column 27, line 22 - line 50 *; | [A]US2003092908 (PITTS WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph [0002]; claim 1 *; | [I]US2007093515 (ARRINGTON MARK P [US], et al) [I] 1-10,12-15 * page 1, paragraph [0002] * * page 1 *; | [I]US2008090834 (HOOVER DENNIS J [US], et al) [I] 1-10,12-15 * page 1, paragraph [0002] * * claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US2008090834 (HOOVER DENNIS J [US], et al); | [Y]US2005202550 (PANDIT JAYVARDHAN [US]) | by applicant | - LIEBERMAN ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (2005), vol. 353, pages 1209 - 1223 | - FUJISHIGE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 18438 - 18445 | - LOUGHNEY ET AL., GENE, (1999), vol. 234, pages 109 - 117 | - SODERLING ET AL., PNAS, USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 7071 - 7076 | - KEHLER ET AL., EXPERT OPIN. THER. PATENTS, (2007), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 147 - 158 | - HUANG, W. ET AL., J. BIOMOL SCREEN, (2002), vol. 7, page 215 | - SIUCIAK ET AL., NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (2006), vol. 51, pages 386 - 396 | - BECKER ET AL., BEHAV BRAIN RES, (2008), vol. 186, no. 2, pages 155 - 60 | - THRELFELL ET AL., J PHARMACOL EXP THER, (2009), vol. 328, no. 3, pages 785 - 795 | - SCHMIDT ET AL., J PHARMACOL EXP THER, (2008), vol. 325, pages 681 - 690 | - MOSSER ET AL., JALA, (2003), vol. 8, pages 54 - 63 | - SOLYMAR, M. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2004), vol. 15, pages 3281 - 3287 |