EP2467058 - DISTRIBUTED EXTERNAL AND INTERNAL WIRELESS SENSOR SYSTEMS FOR CHARACTERIZATION OF SURFACE AND SUBSURFACE BIOMEDICAL STRUCTURE AND CONDITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAISER, William, J. 15520 Casiano Court Los Angeles CA 90077 / US | 02 /
SARRAFZADEH, Majid 255 Health Terrace Anahelm Hills CA 92807 / US | 03 /
ABERLE, Denise 16422 Sloan Drive Los Angeles CA 90049 / US | 04 /
BATALIN, Maxim 5244 Renaissance Avenue San Diego CA 92122 / US | 05 /
MEHRNIA, Alireza 420 Westwood Plaza Los Angeles CA 90095 / US | 06 /
NAHAPETIAN, Ani 3304 Deer Creek Lane Glendale CA 91208 / US | 07 /
SAYRE, James 5562 N. Fairgange Drive Agoura Hills CA 91301 / US | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10810502.4 | 17.08.2010 | WO2010US45784 | Priority number, date | US20090234524P | 17.08.2009 Original published format: US 234524 P | US20090234494P | 17.08.2009 Original published format: US 234494 P | US20090234506P | 17.08.2009 Original published format: US 234506 P | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011022418 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2467058 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05, A61B5/04, A61B5/02, A61B5/01 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
A61B5/0031 (EP,US);
A61B5/0059 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/01 (EP,US);
A61B5/015 (KR);
A61B5/02158 (KR);
A61B5/053 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0537 (KR);
A61B5/08 (EP,US);
A61B5/291 (KR);
A61B5/445 (EP,US);
A61B5/6804 (EP,US);
A61B5/6833 (EP,KR,US);
A61B7/005 (EP,US);
A61B7/006 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0214 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0261 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0271 (EP,US);
A61B2562/164 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | VERTEILTE EXTERNE UND INTERNE DRAHTLOSSENSORENSYSTEME ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER BIOMEDIZINISCHEN STRUKTUR UND DES BIOMEDIZINISCHEN ZUSTANDS VON OBERFLÄCHEN UND UNTEROBERFLÄCHEN | [2012/26] | English: | DISTRIBUTED EXTERNAL AND INTERNAL WIRELESS SENSOR SYSTEMS FOR CHARACTERIZATION OF SURFACE AND SUBSURFACE BIOMEDICAL STRUCTURE AND CONDITION | [2012/26] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE CAPTEURS SANS FIL EXTERNES ET INTERNES DISTRIBUÉS POUR LA CARACTÉRISATION D'UNE STRUCTURE ET D'UNE CONDITION BIOMÉDICALE DE SURFACE ET DE SOUS-SURFACE | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 21.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 11.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007270672 (HAYTER PAUL G [US]) [X] 1-5,10,11,14,16 * paragraphs [0123] - [0141]; figures 9-13B * [I] 6,7,17; | [XI]WO2008076464 (SURGISENSE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,10-12,14-16 * paragraphs [0032] - [0038]; figures 1-8 * [I] 8,9,18; | [A]US6285899 (GHAEM SANJAR [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 5, lines 10-27 * | International search | [A]US2006289640 (MERCURE PETER K [US], et al); | [A]US2005043601 (KILCOYNE JOHN T [US], et al); | [A]US2008269573 (NAJAFI NADER [US], et al); | [A]US2005027175 (YANG ZHONGPING [US]) |