EP2467557 - METHOD OF FORMING A CUTTING ELEMENT FOR EARTH-BORING TOOLS HAVING DIFFERENT INTERSTITIAL MATERIALS IN MULTI-LAYER DIAMOND TABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/26] | CUTTING ELEMENTS HAVING DIFFERENT INTERSTITIAL MATERIALS IN MULTI-LAYER DIAMOND TABLES, EARTH-BORING TOOLS INCLUDING SUCH CUTTING ELEMENTS, AND METHODS OF FORMING SAME | ||
[2019/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes, a GE company, LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, TX 77073 / US | [2020/08] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated P. O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMITZ, Kurtis 2109 Mulberry Creek Yukon, Oklahoma 73099 / US | 02 /
SCOTT, Danny, E. 3015 Poe Drive Montgomery, Texas 77356 / US | [2020/18] |
Former [2012/26] | 01 /
SCHMITZ, Kurtis 2109 Mulberry Creek Yukon Oklahoma 73099 / US | ||
02 /
SCOTT, Danny, E. 3015 Poe Drive Montgomery Texas 77356 / US | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2012/26] | Chiva, Andrew Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10810504.0 | 17.08.2010 | [2020/18] | WO2010US45789 | Priority number, date | US20090544954 | 20.08.2009 Original published format: US 544954 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011022421 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2467557 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2467557 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/54, E21B10/42, B22F3/12, B22F7/06, B24D99/00, B22F3/14, C22C26/00, E21B10/55, E21B10/567 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
E21B10/567 (EP,US);
B24D99/005 (EP,US);
C22C26/00 (EP,US);
E21B10/55 (EP,US);
B22F3/14 (EP,US);
C22C2204/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | E21B10/54, E21B10/42, B22F3/12, B22F7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG VON SCHNEIDEELEMENTEN FÜR ERDBOHRWERKZEUGE MIT VERSCHIEDENEN ZWISCHENMATERIALIEN IN MEHRSCHICHTIGEN DIAMANTTAFELN | [2019/47] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING A CUTTING ELEMENT FOR EARTH-BORING TOOLS HAVING DIFFERENT INTERSTITIAL MATERIALS IN MULTI-LAYER DIAMOND TABLES | [2019/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FORMATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE COUPE POUR OUTILS DE FORAGE DE TERRE COMPORTANT DES MATÉRIAUX INTERSTITIELS DIFFÉRENTS DANS DES TABLES À DIAMANT MULTICOUCHES | [2019/47] |
Former [2012/26] | SCHNEIDEELEMENTE MIT VERSCHIEDENEN ZWISCHENMATERIALIEN IN MEHRSCHICHTIGEN DIAMANTTAFELN, ERDBOHRWERKZEUGE MIT SOLCHEN SCHNEIDEELEMENTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER FORMUNG | ||
Former [2012/26] | CUTTING ELEMENTS HAVING DIFFERENT INTERSTITIAL MATERIALS IN MULTI-LAYER DIAMOND TABLES, EARTH-BORING TOOLS INCLUDING SUCH CUTTING ELEMENTS, AND METHODS OF FORMING SAME | ||
Former [2012/26] | ÉLÉMENTS DE COUPE COMPORTANT DES MATÉRIAUX INTERSTITIELS DIFFÉRENTS DANS DES TABLES À DIAMANT MULTICOUCHES, OUTILS DE FORAGE DE TERRE COMPRENANT DE TELS ÉLÉMENTS DE COUPE, ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LEUR FORMATION | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 08.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.08.2010 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | IT | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | TR | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | LU | 17.08.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | FR | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.08.2010 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 17.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
FR | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 17.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
FR | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 17.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
FR | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 17.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
FR | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 17.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 17.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4380471 (LEE MINYOUNG, et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,15,17 * column 2, line 22 - line 30 * * column 4, line 5 - line 6; example 3; claims 3,4 *[Y] 18; | [XY]US2009114454 (BELNAP JOHN DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,15,17 * paragraph [0041]; claim 1 * [Y] 18 | International search | [X]US2008206576 (QIAN JIANG [US], et al); | [A]US2008302579 (KESHAVAN MADAPUSI K [US], et al); | [A]US2009090563 (VORONIN GEORGIY [US], et al) | Examination | US2007144790 | by applicant | US5127923 |