EP2475413 - BREATHING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smiths Medical International Limited 1500 Eureka Park Lower Pemberton Ashford, Kent TN25 4BF / GB | [2012/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETTITT, Emily The Steps New England Lane Playden Rye East Sussex TN31 7NT / GB | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | Flint, Jonathan McNeill Smiths Medical 6 Millfield House Woodshots Meadow Croxley Business Park Watford WD18 8YX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Flint, Jonathan McNeill Smiths Medical 6 Millfield House Woodshots Meadow Croxley Business Park Watford WD18 8YX / GB | Application number, filing date | 10810827.5 | 31.08.2010 | WO2010GB01638 | Priority number, date | GB20090015818 | 10.09.2009 Original published format: GB 0915818 | [2012/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011030085 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2475413 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06, A61M16/22, A61M16/00 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
A61M16/06 (EP,US);
A61M16/0009 (EP,US);
A61M16/0627 (EP,US);
A61M16/22 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0208 (EP,US);
A61M2202/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Title | German: | BEATMUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2012/29] | English: | BREATHING APPARATUS | [2012/29] | French: | APPAREIL RESPIRATOIRE | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/34] | 02.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB828731 (MINI OF SUPPLY) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 47 - page 2, line 62; figure 1 *; | [X]US2003135915 (LUPPI LIBERO [IT]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031]; figures 6,7 *; | [X]WO2007128571 (UNIV INNSBRUCK [AT], et al) [X] 1* page 5, line 26 - page 7, line 3; figures 1-4 * |