EP2464162 - METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR TESTING PERFORMANCE OF WIRELESS NETWORK CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Yu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Yinghua Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10811276.4 | 26.08.2010 | WO2010CN76368 | Priority number, date | CN200910171429 | 28.08.2009 Original published format: CN200910171429 | [2012/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011023116 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2464162 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/08 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
H04W24/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRÜFEN DER LEISTUNG EINER DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKZELLE | [2012/24] | English: | METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR TESTING PERFORMANCE OF WIRELESS NETWORK CELL | [2012/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ÉQUIPEMENT POUR TESTER LES PERFORMANCES DE CELLULE DE RÉSEAU SANS FIL | [2012/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2012 | Translation filed | 08.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 27.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 10.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009031959 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-6,9-11,13-15 * Method of testing performance of network; triggered by traffic; neighboring BS emulates MS trying to access the tested BS; page 7, line 29 - page 14, line 9 * [I] 7,8,12; | [A]US2006063521 (CHEUNG BENJAMIN [US], et al) [A] 1,9,14,15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0010] * * Detecting sleeping cells; triggering of performance test based on traffic info; paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0033] * | [A] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "MDT: Relation to SON functions", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-091542, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090820), no. Shenzhen, China; 20090820, XP050352962 [A] 1,9,14,15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * | [A] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "Consideration on reporting policy for MDT", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-093709, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090623), no. Los Angeles, USA; 20090623, XP050351943 [A] 1,9,14,15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]CN1753541 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [XP]CN101646189 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN1232600 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI]); | [A]CN1578488 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]US7133434 (TOSKALA ANTTI [FI], et al) |