EP2474579 - SCALE-SHAPED FILMY FINES DISPERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oike & Co., Ltd. 181, Tokusayama-cho, Nishinotoin Nishi-iru Bukkoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8461 / JP | [2012/33] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states Oike & Co., Ltd. 181 Tokusayama-cho Nishi-iru Nishinotoin Bukkoji Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8461 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKENAKA, Toshio c/o OIKE & Co., LTD. 34 Kamitoba Kitatonomoto-cho Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8122 / JP | 02 /
HIROTA, Masato c/o OIKE & CO. LTD. 34 Kamitoba Kitatonomoto-cho Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8122 / JP | [2021/33] |
Former [2012/28] | 01 /
TAKENAKA, Toshio c/o OIKE & CO. LTD. 34 Kimitoba Kitatonomoto-cho Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8122 / JP | ||
02 /
HIROTA, Masato c/o OIKE & CO. LTD. 34 Kamitoba Kitatonomoto-cho Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8122 / JP | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charkes Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10811466.1 | 18.08.2010 | [2021/40] | WO2010JP05091 | Priority number, date | JP20090199457 | 31.08.2009 Original published format: JP 2009199457 | [2012/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011024407 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2474579 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2474579 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/00, B22F9/04, C09D11/00, C09C1/62, C23C14/00, C23C14/20 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
C23C14/205 (EP,US);
B22F1/068 (EP,US);
B22F1/147 (EP,US);
B22F9/04 (EP,US);
C09C1/62 (EP,US);
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
C23C14/0005 (EP,US);
C01P2004/20 (EP,US);
C01P2004/22 (EP,US);
C01P2004/54 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/28] | C09D11/00, B22F1/00, B22F9/00, B41J2/01, B41M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEINE FILMDISPERSION IN ABLAGERUNGSFORM | [2012/28] | English: | SCALE-SHAPED FILMY FINES DISPERSION | [2012/28] | French: | DISPERSION DE FINES RECOUVERTES D'UNE PELLICULE ET EN FORME D'ÉCAILLES | [2012/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2012 | Translation filed | 21.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 20.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.01.2021 | 12.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2019 | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2010 | AL | 06.10.2021 | AT | 06.10.2021 | CY | 06.10.2021 | CZ | 06.10.2021 | DK | 06.10.2021 | EE | 06.10.2021 | ES | 06.10.2021 | FI | 06.10.2021 | HR | 06.10.2021 | IT | 06.10.2021 | LT | 06.10.2021 | LV | 06.10.2021 | MC | 06.10.2021 | MK | 06.10.2021 | MT | 06.10.2021 | NL | 06.10.2021 | PL | 06.10.2021 | RO | 06.10.2021 | SE | 06.10.2021 | SI | 06.10.2021 | SK | 06.10.2021 | SM | 06.10.2021 | TR | 06.10.2021 | BG | 06.01.2022 | NO | 06.01.2022 | GR | 07.01.2022 | IS | 06.02.2022 | PT | 07.02.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 18.08.2010 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
TR | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 18.08.2010 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 18.08.2010 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 18.08.2010 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 06.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1862511 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0050] ** example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1942157 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0081] * * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1950260 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0145] * * claim - * | International search | [A]JP2003026956 (OIKE KOGYO KK); | [X]WO2006101054 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al); | [X]JP2007131741 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [X]JP2008174712 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2008202076 (OIKE KOGYO KK); | [X]JP2008208330 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [X]JP2008208332 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [X]JP2008239951 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [XP]JP2009256565 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [XP]JP2010018651 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [XP]JP2010168411 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [XP]JP2010168412 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) | Examination | JP2008174712 | by applicant | JPH11323223 | JPH11343436 | JP2009199457 |