EP2471959 - ARC MELTING FACILITY, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MOLTEN METAL USING THE ARC MELTING FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JP Steel Plantech Co. 3-1, Kinko-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 221-0056 / JP | [2012/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKAMI, Yasuki c/o JP STEEL PLANTECH CO. 3-1 Kinko-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0056 / JP | 02 /
MATSUO, Takato c/o JP STEEL PLANTECH CO. 3-1 Kinko-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0056 / JP | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10812031.2 | 23.08.2010 | WO2010JP64659 | Priority number, date | JP20090196451 | 27.08.2009 Original published format: JP 2009196451 | [2012/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011024982 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2471959 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/52, F27B3/28, F27D17/00, F27D19/00, F27D21/00, H05B7/144, H05B7/148 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
C21C5/52 (KR);
C21C5/5211 (EP,US);
F27B3/28 (EP,KR,US);
F27D13/002 (EP,US);
F27D17/00 (KR);
F27D19/00 (EP,US);
F27D21/00 (EP,US);
H05B7/144 (EP,KR,US);
H05B7/148 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Title | German: | LICHTBOGENSCHMELZANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METALLSCHMELZE MIT EINER LICHTBOGENSCHMELZANLAGE | [2012/27] | English: | ARC MELTING FACILITY, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MOLTEN METAL USING THE ARC MELTING FACILITY | [2012/27] | French: | INSTALLATION DE FUSION À ARC ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MÉTAL FONDU À L'AIDE DE L'INSTALLATION DE FUSION À ARC | [2012/27] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2012 | Translation filed | 12.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 01.10.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH11257859 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [A]JPH1183330 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [A]JPH03127486 (EBARA INFILCO) | [Y] - STEEL PLANTECH CO., KANKYO TAIOGATA KO KORITSU ARC-RO, YUSHU KANKYO SOCHI, (200606), vol. 32, pages 87 - 95, XP008158424 | by applicant | JPS61502899 | JPH11257859 | JPH07286208 |