EP2470173 - COMBINATION THERAPY WITH NANOPARTICLE COMPOSITIONS OF TAXANE AND HEDGEHOG INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abraxis BioScience, LLC 11755 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2100 Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US | [2015/36] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Abraxis BioScience, LLC 11755 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2100 Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAO, Chunlin 1800 Camden Avenue Suite No.301 Los Angeles CA 90025 / US | 02 /
DESAI, Neil, P. 11755 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2100 Los Angeles CA 90025 / US | 03 /
SOON-SHIONG, Patrick 149 South Barrington Avenue No.311 Los Angeles CA 90049 / US | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2016/17] |
Former [2012/27] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10812593.1 | 25.08.2010 | [2016/17] | WO2010US46684 | Priority number, date | US20090236813P | 25.08.2009 Original published format: US 236813 P | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011025838 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2470173 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2470173 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/337, A61K9/20 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
A61K9/5169 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/42 (KR,US);
A61K31/4355 (KR,US);
A61K31/7056 (KR,US);
A61K9/0053 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | 21.03.2012 | ME | 21.03.2012 | RS | 21.03.2012 | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE MIT NANOPARTIKELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS TAXAN UND HEDGEHOG-HEMMERN | [2012/27] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY WITH NANOPARTICLE COMPOSITIONS OF TAXANE AND HEDGEHOG INHIBITORS | [2012/27] | French: | PLURITHÉRAPIE AVEC DES COMPOSITIONS NANOPARTICULAIRES DE TAXANE ET DES INHIBITEURS HEDGEHOG | [2012/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 10.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 09.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16167017.9 / EP3103452 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | LV | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | MK | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SM | 27.04.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | BG | 27.04.2016 | |
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CY | 27.04.2016 | |
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | CY | 27.04.2016 | |
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CY | 27.04.2016 | |
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | EE | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | EE | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | EE | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006039569 (UNIV CHICAGO [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * examples 8-13; claims 1, 9 *; | [A] - HAWKINS ET AL, "Protein Nanoparticles as drug carriers in clinical medicine.", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY, (20080207), vol. 60, pages 876 - 885, XP002696596 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2007.08.044 | [A] - LOBO ET AL, "Paclitaxel albumin bound particles in combination with bevacizumab with or without gemcitabine.", BIOMEDICINE AND PHARMACOTHERAPY., (20070912), vol. 61, pages 531 - 533, XP002696597 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.BIOPHA.2007.08.008 | International search | [Y]US2007116761 (DESAI NEIL P [US], et al); | [Y]US2007281040 (WEICHSELBAUM RALPH R [US], et al); | [Y]US2009123932 (MES-MASSON ANNE-MARIE [CA], et al); | [A]WO2009086324 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) | Examination | - LI ET AL, ADV. DRUG. DELIV. REV, (20080522), vol. 60, no. 8, pages 886 - 898 | - LANGER ET AL, J.THORACIC ONCOL., (20080601), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 623 - 630 | by applicant | US5916596 | US6096331 | US6506405 | US6537579 | US2003166543 | US2004038876 | US2004110663 | US6749868 | US2004127474 | US2005004002 | US2005085519 | US2005112125 | US2005222087 | US2006263434 | US2007082838 | US2008019961 | WO2008137148 | WO2009086416 | US2010037986 | US2010037717 | - RUBIN ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS DRUG DISCOVERY, (2006), vol. 5, pages 1026 - 1033 | - BRUNTON ET AL., J. MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 51, no. 5, pages 1108 - 1110 | - ROMER ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2005), vol. 65, pages 4975 - 4978 | - CHEN ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (2002), vol. 99, no. 22, pages 14071 - 14076 | - TAIPALE ET AL., NATURE, (2002), vol. 418, pages 892 - 897 | - TAIPALE ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 406, pages 1005 - 1009 | - TULLIS, JAMA, (1977), vol. 237, pages 355 - 360,460-463 | - HOUSER ET AL., SURGERY, GYNECOLOGY AND OBSTETRICS, (1980), vol. 150, pages 811 - 816 | - FINLAYSON, SEMINARS IN THROMBOSIS AND HEMOSTASIS, (1980), vol. 6, pages 85 - 120 | - FEHSKE ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMCOL., vol. 30, pages 687 - 92 | - VORUM, DAN. MED. BULL., (1999), vol. 46, pages 379 - 99 | - KRAGH-HANSEN, DAN. MED. BULL., (1990), vol. 1441, pages 131 - 40 | - CURRY ET AL., NAT. STRUCT. BIOL., (1998), vol. 5, pages 827 - 35 | - SUGIO ET AL., PROTEIN. ENG., (1999), vol. 12, pages 439 - 46 | - HE ET AL., NATURE, vol. 358, pages 209 - 15 | - CARTER ET AL., ADV. PROTEIN. CHEM., (1994), vol. 45, pages 153 - 203 | - PAAL ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., vol. 268, no. 7, pages 2187 - 91 | - PURCELL ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2000), vol. 1478, pages 61 - 8 | - ALTMAYER ET AL., ARZNEIMITTELFORSCHUNG, (1995), vol. 45, pages 1053 - 6 | - GARRIDO ET AL., REV. ESP. ANESTESTIOL. REANIM., (1994), vol. 41, pages 308 - 12 | - URIEN ET AL., INVEST. NEW DRUGS, (1996), vol. 14, pages 147 - 51 | - S. R. HINGORANI ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2005), vol. 7, page 469 |