EP2417129 - TRIAZINE-ARYL-BIS-INDOLES AS PDE-4 INHIBITORS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF ASTHMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/07] | TRIAZINE-ARYL-BIS-INDOLES AND PROCESS FOR PREPARATION THEREOF | ||
[2015/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council of Scientific & Industrial Research Anusandhan Bhawan, 2 Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANGAVARAM, Vasanta, Madhava, Sharma Indian Institute of Chemical Technology Uppal Road 500607 Hyderabad / IN | 02 /
YADAV, Jhillu, Singh Indian Institute of Chemical Technology Uppal Road 500607 Hyderabad / IN | 03 /
PALAKODETY, Radha, Krishna Indian Institute of Chemical Technology Uppal Road 500607 Hyderabad / IN | 04 /
BANDYOPADHYAY, Arun Indian Institute of Chemical Biology 4 Raja S C Mullick Road 700032 Kolkata / IN | 05 /
ROY, Siddhartha Indian Institute of Chemical Biology 4 Raja S C Mullick Road 700032 Kolkata / IN | 06 /
BANDYOPADHYAY, Santu Indian Institute of Chemical Biology 4 Raja S C Mullick Road 700032 Kolkata / IN | 07 /
JOHRI, Rakesh, Kamal Indian Institute of Integrative Medicine Canal Road 180001 Jammu / IN | 08 /
SHARMA, Subhash, Chander Indian Institute of Integrative Medicine Canal Road 180001 Jammu / IN | 09 /
GHOSH, Balaram Institute of Genomics and Integrative Biology Near Jubilee Hall Mall Road 110007 New Delhi / IN | 10 /
ULAGANATHAN, Mabalirajan Institute of Genomics and Integrative Biology Near Jubilee Hall Mall Road 110007 New Delhi / IN | 11 /
BALWANI, Sakshi Institute of Genomics and Integrative Biology Near Jubilee Hall Mall Road 110007 New Delhi / IN | 12 /
PAUL, Bholanath Indian Institute of Toxicology Research Mahatma Gandhi Marg 226001 Lucknow / IN | 13 /
SAXENA, Ashok, Kumar Indian Institute of Toxicology Research Mahatma Gandhi Marg 226001 Lucknow / IN | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Gevers & Orès 36 rue de Saint-Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/07] | Mena, Sandra, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10812801.8 | 31.12.2010 | [2016/12] | WO2010IB03375 | Priority number, date | IN2010DEL0175 | 29.01.2010 Original published format: IN DE01752010 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011092547 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2417129 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2417129 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/14, C07D251/52, C07D251/50, A61K31/53, A61P11/06 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
C07D251/50 (EP,US);
C07D251/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRIAZIN-ARYL-BIS-INDOLE ALS PDE-4 HEMMER VERWENDBAR FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON ASTHMA | [2015/42] | English: | TRIAZINE-ARYL-BIS-INDOLES AS PDE-4 INHIBITORS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF ASTHMA | [2015/42] | French: | TRIAZINE-ARYL-BIS-INDOLES COMME INHIBITEURS DE PDE-4 UTILES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ASTHME | [2015/42] |
Former [2012/07] | TRIAZIN-ARYL-BIS-INDOLE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2012/07] | TRIAZINE-ARYL-BIS-INDOLES AND PROCESS FOR PREPARATION THEREOF | ||
Former [2012/07] | TRIAZINE-ARYL-BIS-INDOLES ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 15.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.12.2010 | AL | 23.03.2016 | AT | 23.03.2016 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | RS | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | IE | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | LU | 31.12.2016 | MT | 31.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 31.12.2010 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
IE | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
LU | 31.12.2016 | ||
MT | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 31.12.2010 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
IE | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
LU | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 31.12.2010 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
IE | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
LU | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
IE | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
LU | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
IE | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
LU | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3451802 (NEIGHBORS RALPH P, et al) [X] 10 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 9; example 1 *; | [A]DD154572 (GUENTHER EBERHARD, et al) [A] 10 * page 7, last compound of table I;;; claim 1 *; | [AD] - F. LEROUX ET AL, "Phosphodiesterase 4 inhibitors as airways smooth muscle relaxant agents: synthesis and biological activities of triazine derivatives", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 509 - 516, XP002634142 [AD] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - NEIL J. PRESS AND KATHARINE H. BANNER, "2 PDE4 inhibitors - A review of the current field", PROGRESS IN MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (2009), vol. 47, ISSN 0079-6468, pages 37 - 74, XP009142806 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [X] - R. M. DESAI ET AL, "Simple and efficient synthetic routes to bioactive s-triazinyl dithiocarbamate derivatives", MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, BIRKHÄUSER-VERLAG, BO, (20080214), vol. 17, no. 8, doi:DOI:10.1007/S00044-008-9093-4, ISSN 1554-8120, pages 495 - 506, XP019658489 [X] 10 * scheme 1, compounds 2;;; table 1; compounds 2a-2j * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00044-008-9093-4 | [A] - G. V. M. SHARMA ET AL, "A versatile and practical synthesis of bis(indolyl)methanes/bis(indol yl)glycoconjugates catalyzed by trichloro-1,3,5-triazine", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 45, no. 41, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.TETLET.2004.08.084, ISSN 0040-4039, (20041004), pages 7729 - 7732, (20040917), XP022797442 [A] 1-7,13 * scheme 1;;; compounds 3a,14a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2004.08.084 | by applicant | US6288104 | JPH11158073 | - DONNELLY, L. E.; ROGERS, D. F., "Therapy for COPD in the 21", DRUGS, (2003), vol. 63, pages 1973 - 1998 | - YEOUNG, K,-P, DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (2009), vol. 14, pages 812 - 813 | - HOUSLAY, M. D.; SCHAFER, P.; ZHANG, K, Y. J., DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (2005), vol. 10, pages 1503 - 1519 | - DAL PIAZ, V.; GIOVANNONI, M. P., EUR. J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 35, page 463480 | - GIEMBYCZ, M. A., MONALDI ARCH CHEST DIS., (2002), vol. 57, pages 48 - 64 | - MOLFINO, N. A., RESPIRATION, (2005), vol. 72, pages 105 - 112 | - CONTI, M.; BEAVO, J., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (2007), vol. 76, pages 481 - 511 | - MULLER, T.; ENGELS, P.; FOZARD, J. R., TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (1996), vol. 17, pages 294 - 298 | - TEIXEIRA, M. M.; GRISTWOOD, R. W.; COOPER, N.; HELLEWELL, P. G., PDE-4 INHIBITORS: TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (1997), vol. 18, pages 164 - 170 | - SMITH, M.; CROUCH, N.; GERICKE, N.; HIRST, M., "Psychoactive constituents of the genus Sceletium N.E.Br. and other Mesembryanthemaceae: review", J. ETHNOPHARMACOL, (1996), vol. 50, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-8741(95)01342-3, pages 119 - 30, XP002040528 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-8741(95)01342-3 | - GRISWOLD, D. E.; WEBB, E. F.; BRETON, J.; WHITE, J. R.; MARSHALL, P. J.; TORPHY, T. J., "Effect of selective phosphodiesterase type 1V inhibitor, rolipram, on fluid and cellular phases of inflammatory response", INFLAMMATION, (1993), vol. 17, doi:doi:10.1007/BF00918994, pages 333 - 4, XP001064263 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00918994 | - SCHNEIDER, H. H.; SCHMIECHEN, R.; BREZNISKI, M.; SEIDLER, J., EUR. J. PHARMOCOL., (1986), vol. 127, pages 105 - 115 | - PROFITA, M; CHIAPPARA G; MIRABELLA, F; CHIMENTI, G DI, L; COSTANZO, G; RICCOBONO, L; BELLIA V; BOUSQUET J; VIGNOLA A, EFFECT OF CILOMILAST (ARIFLO) ON TNF-, IL-8 AND GM-CSF RELEASE BY AIRWAY CELLS OF PATIENTS WITH COPD, (2003), vol. 58, pages 573 - 579 | - OCHIAI, H.; OHTANI, T.; ISHIDA, A.; KUSUMI, K.; KATO, M.; KOHNO, H.; KISHIKAWA, K.; OBATA, T.; NAKAI, H.; TODA, M., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2004), vol. 14, pages 207 - 10 | - HATZELMANN, A.; SCHUDT, C., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2001), vol. 297, pages 267 - 290 | - SOUNESS, J. E.; RAO, S., CELL SIGNAL, (1997), vol. 9, pages 227 - 236 | - DUPLANTIER, A. J. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 120 - 125 | - HIGUCHI, K.; KAWASAKI, T., NAT. PRO. REP., (2007), vol. 24, pages 843 - 868 | - O'CONNOR, S. E.; MARESH, J., NAT. PRO. REP., (2006), vol. 23, pages 532 - 547 | - OLGEN, S.; KAESSLER, K.; NEBIOGLU, D.; JOACHIM, J., CHEM. BIOL. DRUG DES., (2007), vol. 70, pages 547 - 551 | - SMART, B. P.; OSLUND, R. S.; WALSH, L. A.; GELB, M., N. J. MED CHEM., (2006), vol. 49, pages 2858 - 2860 | - HOPKINS, C. R. ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2005), vol. 15, pages 2734 - 2737 | - KUSS, H.; HOEFGEN, N.; JOHANSSEN, S.; KRONBACH, T.; RUNDFELDT, C. J., PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2003), vol. 307, pages 373 - 385 | - LEROUX, F.; VAN KEULEN, B. J.; DALIERS, J.; POMMERY, N.; HENICHART, J. P., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1999), vol. 7, pages 509 - 516 | - RAVIKANTH, V.; IMELDA, 0.; WAGNER-DOBLER, 1.; LAATSCH, H. J., NAT. PRO., (2003), vol. 66, pages 1520 - 1523 | - TAKAGI, K.; HATTORI, T.; KUNISADA, H.; YUKI, Y., JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: PART A: POLYMER CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 38, pages 4385 - 4395 | - KO ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2004), vol. 68, pages 2087 - 2094 |