EP2476926 - SEALED ROLLING BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2012/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA Takeshi c/o NTN CORPORATION 3066 Aza Oyumida Oaza Higashikata Kuwana-shi Mie 511-0811 / JP | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10813613.6 | 13.08.2010 | WO2010JP63739 | Priority number, date | JP20090205394 | 07.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009205394 | [2012/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011027662 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2476926 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/78, F16C19/52, F16C23/08, F16C33/48 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
F16C19/52 (EP,US);
F16C23/086 (EP,US);
F16C33/485 (EP,US);
F16C33/66 (EP,US);
F16C33/7806 (EP,US);
F16C33/7893 (EP,US);
F16C41/008 (EP,US);
F16C19/38 (EP,US);
F16C2226/40 (EP,US);
F16C2233/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Title | German: | ABGEDICHTETES WÄLZLAGER | [2012/29] | English: | SEALED ROLLING BEARING | [2012/29] | French: | PALIER À ROULEMENT RENDU ÉTANCHE | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2012 | Translation filed | 06.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 08.01.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2003202023 (NSK LTD); | [X]JP2003161318 (NSK LTD) | by applicant | JPH0712736Y | JPH09317760 | JP2007198540 |