EP2474351 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF LIPOSOMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomedcore Inc. Techno-Core Yokohama-Kanazawa High Tech Center 1-1-1, Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | For all designated states Toray Engineering Co., Ltd. Nihonbashi Muromachi Bldg. 3-16 Nihonbashi- Hongokucho 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0021 / JP | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Yoshitaka c/o BIOMEDCORE INC. Techno-Core Yokohama-Kanazawa High Tech Center 1-1-1 Fukuura, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 02 /
SATOH, Yuichiro c/o BIOMEDCORE INC. Techno-Core Yokohama-Kanazawa High Tech Center 1-1-1 Fukuura, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 03 /
MIBE, Yasuhiko c/o BIOMEDCORE INC. Techno-Core Yokohama-Kanazawa High Tech Center 1-1-1 Fukuura, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 04 /
KURODA, Masakazu c/o TORAY ENGINEERING CO. LTD. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu Shiga 520-0842 / JP | 05 /
TSUDA, Yuichiro c/o TORAY ENGINEERING CO. LTD. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu Shiga 520-0842 / JP | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10813633.4 | 24.08.2010 | WO2010JP64239 | Priority number, date | JP20090203054 | 02.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009203054 | JP20100144231 | 24.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010144231 | [2012/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011027684 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2474351 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/04, A61K9/127, A61K8/14 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
B01J13/04 (EP,US);
A61K9/1277 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LIPOSOMEN | [2012/28] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF LIPOSOMES | [2012/28] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE LIPOSOMES | [2012/28] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2012 | Translation filed | 02.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 15.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 20.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2006273812 (TERUMO CORP) [X] 9 * Example 4, paragraph [0076]. * [A] 1-8; | [A]US6331314 (KLINKSIEK BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * Figure 1; Examples 1-3. * | International search | [X]JPH03181415 (TERUMO CORP); | [X]JP2002509121 (DU PONT PHARMACEUTICALS CO.); | [A]JP2002536316 (ALZA CORP.) | by applicant | JP2006517594 | JPH06509547 | - A. D. BANGHAM ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1965), vol. 13, pages 238 - 252 | - A. D. BANGHAM; R. W. HORNE, J. MOL. BIOL., (1964), vol. 8, pages 660 - 668 |