EP2470431 - CONTAINER BLANK AND CONTAINER WITH DENESTING FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, Inc. 814 Livingston Court Marietta, GA 30067 / US | [2012/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WNEK, Patrick, H. N 7738 Sundown Court Sherwood, WI 54169 / US | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10814288.6 | 26.08.2010 | WO2010US46739 | Priority number, date | US20090275215P | 26.08.2009 Original published format: US 275215 P | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011028588 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2470431 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2470431 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/34, A47G19/03, B65D5/24 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
B65D1/34 (EP,US);
A47G19/03 (EP,US);
B65D21/0233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTERROHLING UND BEHÄLTER MIT ENTPACKUNGSFUNKTION | [2012/27] | English: | CONTAINER BLANK AND CONTAINER WITH DENESTING FEATURE | [2012/27] | French: | ÉBAUCHE DE CONTENANT ET CONTENANT AVEC UN ÉLÉMENT DE DÉSEMPILEMENT | [2012/27] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 10.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2010 | AL | 21.01.2015 | AT | 21.01.2015 | BE | 21.01.2015 | CY | 21.01.2015 | CZ | 21.01.2015 | DK | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | ES | 21.01.2015 | FI | 21.01.2015 | HR | 21.01.2015 | IT | 21.01.2015 | LT | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MC | 21.01.2015 | MK | 21.01.2015 | MT | 21.01.2015 | NL | 21.01.2015 | PL | 21.01.2015 | PT | 21.01.2015 | RO | 21.01.2015 | SE | 21.01.2015 | SI | 21.01.2015 | SK | 21.01.2015 | SM | 21.01.2015 | TR | 21.01.2015 | BG | 21.04.2015 | NO | 21.04.2015 | GR | 22.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | IE | 26.08.2015 | LU | 26.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 26.08.2010 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PT | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 26.08.2010 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 26.08.2010 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 26.08.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 26.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 21.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1939225 (THIEL ALFONS W) [X] 1-4,10 * page 6, paragraph 2; figure 1 * | International search | [X]US2007235514 (ABAYHAN AYBERK [US], et al); | [X]US2004262322 (MIDDLETON SCOTT WILLIAM [US], et al); | [Y]KR200318533Y (SESEM CO., LTD.); | [A]US2005109653 (WNEK PATRICK H [US], et al) | by applicant | US2007235514 | DE1939225 | US2005109653 |