EP2473586 - BIO-BASED WAX COMPOSITIONS AND APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galata Chemicals, LLC 464 Heritage Road Southbury, CT 06488 / US | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLOCK, Andrew J. 37 Riverside Court Southington CT 06489 / US | 02 /
MCKEOWN, Steven 4 Revere Circle Southbury CT 06488 / US | 03 /
WISNEFSKY, Eric 88 Britiani Drive Southbury CT 06488 / US | 04 /
FRENKEL, Peter 2102 Eaton Court Danbury CT 06811 / US | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10814388.4 | 01.09.2010 | WO2010US47437 | Priority number, date | US20090238940P | 01.09.2009 Original published format: US 238940 P | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011028744 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2473586 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C11C5/00, C11C3/00, C08L91/06 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
C08L91/00 (EP,US);
C08L91/06 (EP,US);
C11C3/006 (EP,US);
C11C5/002 (EP,US);
C08L2205/08 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L91/06, C08L91/00, C08L91/00, C08L91/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/28] | C10L5/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Title | German: | WACHSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND -ANWENDUNGEN AUF BIOLOGISCHER BASIS | [2012/28] | English: | BIO-BASED WAX COMPOSITIONS AND APPLICATIONS | [2012/28] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE CIRE D'ORIGINE BIOLOGIQUE ET APPLICATIONS | [2012/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 22.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/18] | 03.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0135018 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-4,10,13,17 * the whole document * [Y] 7-9,14 [I] 5,6,11,12,18; | [Y]US3641239 (MOHRLOK SHARON R) [Y] 7-9,14 * column 16, line 43 - line 59 *; | [I]US3898039 (LIN TONG JOE) [I] 1,2,4,11,12,14-16 * column 5, line 45 - line 59 *; | [XI]DE4427879 (CHEMTEC LEUNA GES FUER CHEMIE [DE]) [X] 1,2,11-13,17 * abstract * * page 2 - page 3, line 20; claims 1-11 * [I] 18; | [A]DE202008000126U (INGENDOH AXEL [DE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2007151480 (BLOOM ET AL.); | [Y]US2008281115 (WANG ET AL.); | [Y]US2009181870 (ROWLAND) |