Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011006164 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2011 | A3 | WO2011006164 | 13.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US24000109 | 04.09.2009 | US22458509 | 10.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8621756 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2014 | B2 | US2012038245 | 16.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24000109 | 04.09.2009 | US201013203743 | 06.09.2010 | WO2010US47931 | 06.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8669689 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2014 | B2 | US2012001518 | 05.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24000109 | 04.09.2009 | US201013203737 | 12.07.2010 | US22458509 | 10.07.2009 | WO2010US41727 | 12.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20120093149 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US24000109 | 04.09.2009 | US22458509 | 10.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013504299 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US24000109 | 04.09.2009 | WO2010US47931 | 06.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012533275 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US24000109 | 04.09.2009 | US22458509 | 10.07.2009 | WO2010US41727 | 12.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2452376 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2014 | A4 | EP2452376 | 16.05.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US24000109 | 04.09.2009 | US22458509 | 10.07.2009 | WO2010US41727 | 12.07.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2474051 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2014 | A4 | EP2474051 | 11.07.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US24000109 | 04.09.2009 | WO2010US47931 | 06.09.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011029081 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2011 | A3 | WO2011029081 | 10.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US24000109 | 04.09.2009 |