EP2513301 - PICHIA PASTORIS DEFICIENT IN ENDOGENOUS SECRETED PROTEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre Hospitalier Universitaire Vaudois (CHUV) Rue du Bugnon 21 1011 Lausanne / CH | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONOD, Michel Service de Dermatologie BT422 Centre Hospitalier Universitaire Vaudois (CHUV) Rue du Bugnon 21 CH-1011 Lausanne / CH | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | KATZAROV S.A. Geneva Business Center 12 Avenue des Morgines 1213 Petit-Lancy / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | KATZAROV S.A. European Patent Attorneys 19, rue des Epinettes 1227 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 10814699.4 | 13.12.2010 | WO2010IB55777 | Priority number, date | WO2009IB55729 | 14.12.2009 Original published format: PCT/IB2009/055729 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011073883 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2513301 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/60, C12N15/10, C12N15/81 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
C12N15/815 (EP,US);
C12N9/60 (EP,US);
C12P21/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | PICHIA PASTORIS OHNE ENDOGENE SEKRETIERTE PROTEASE | [2012/43] | English: | PICHIA PASTORIS DEFICIENT IN ENDOGENOUS SECRETED PROTEASE | [2012/43] | French: | PICHIA PASTORIS DÉFICIENTE EN PROTÉASE ENDOGÈNE SÉCRÉTÉE | [2012/43] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 23.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/25] | 04.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDY]US5691166 (GLEESON MARTIN A [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [XP] - SALAMIN KARINE ET AL, "Secretion of an Endogenous Subtilisin by Pichia pastoris Strains GS115 and KM71", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (201007), vol. 76, no. 13, pages 4269 - 4276, XP002631768 [XP] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.00412-10 | [I] - DE SCHUTTER KRISTOF ET AL, "Genome sequence of the recombinant protein production host Pichia pastoris", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 27, no. 6, doi:DOI:10.1038/NBT.1544, ISSN 1087-0156, (20090601), page 561, (20090524), XP002544776 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * * page 565, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1544 | [I] - "SubName: Full=Vacuolar proteinase B (YscB), a serine protease of the subtilisin family;", UniProt, (20090707), Database accession no. C4QYT0, URL: EBI, XP002631769 [I] 1-8 * compound . * | [XY] - MACAULEY-PATRICK SUE ET AL, "Heterologous protein production using the Pichia pastoris expression system", YEAST, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, GB, (20050301), vol. 22, no. 4, doi:DOI:10.1002/YEA.1208, ISSN 0749-503X, pages 249 - 270, XP002474659 [X] 1-5,7,8 * the whole document * * page 255, line 18 - line 32 * [Y] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/yea.1208 | [A] - SINHA JAYANTA ET AL, "Causes of proteolytic degradation of secreted recombinant proteins produced in methylotrophic yeast Pichia pastoris: Case study with recombinant ovine interferon-tau", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20050105), vol. 89, no. 1, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 102 - 112, XP002631770 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.20318 | by applicant | US5691166 | WO9914347 | WO9000192 | US5190931 | - JAYANTA SINHA ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (2005), vol. 89, pages 102 - 112 | - JONES, METHODS ENZYMOL, (1991), vol. 194, pages 428 - 453 | - KLIONSKY ET AL., MICROBIOL. REV., (1990), vol. 54, pages 266 - 292 | - RAYMOND ET AL., INT. REV. CYTOL., (1992), vol. 139, pages 59 - 120 | - ZHENGJUN LI ET AL., PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (2001), vol. 21, pages 438 - 445 | - DIETHARD MATTANOVICH ET AL., MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, (2009), vol. 8, page 29 | - CARILLO, H.; LIPMAN, D., SIAM J. APPLIED MATH., (1988), vol. 48, page 1073 | - MILLER ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, pages 1714 - 1721 | - MAY, G., Applied Molecular Genetics of Filamentous, BLACKIE ACADEMIC AND PROFESSIONAL, (1992), pages 1 - 25 | - TURNER, G., Vectors for Genetic Manipulation, ELSEVIER, (1994), pages 641 - 665 |