EP2479613 - PHOTOPOLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION, COLOR FILTER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, SOLID-STATE IMAGE PICKUP ELEMENT, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE, LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING ORIGINAL PLATE, AND NOVEL COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKINO, Masaomi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10815242.2 | 10.08.2010 | WO2010JP63585 | Priority number, date | JP20090211931 | 14.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009211931 | [2012/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011030645 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2479613 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/031, C07D209/82, C07D295/14, C07D335/06, C07D339/08, C07D491/048, G02B5/20, G02F1/1335, G03F7/00, G03F7/004, H01L27/14 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
C07D209/82 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/00 (US);
C07D209/86 (EP,KR,US);
C07D209/88 (EP,KR,US);
C07D295/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D295/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D295/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07D311/68 (EP,KR,US);
C07D335/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D339/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D339/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07D491/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D491/048 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/201 (KR);
G02B5/223 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133516 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0007 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0045 (KR);
G03F7/031 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14621 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/14643 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Title | German: | PHOTOPOLYMERISIERBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, FARBFILTER, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG, FESTKÖRPERBILDGEBUNGSELEMENT, FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE, ORIGINAL-LITHOGRAPHIEDRUCKPLATTE UND NEUARTIGE VERBINDUNG | [2012/30] | English: | PHOTOPOLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITION, COLOR FILTER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, SOLID-STATE IMAGE PICKUP ELEMENT, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE, LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING ORIGINAL PLATE, AND NOVEL COMPOUND | [2012/30] | French: | COMPOSITION PHOTOPOLYMÉRISABLE, FILTRE COLORÉ, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ÉLÉMENT DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE TRANSISTORISÉ, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, PLAQUE ORIGINALE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE ET NOUVEAU COMPOSÉ | [2012/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2012 | Translation filed | 12.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 24.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005319758 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,15* page 20; compounds OS-88 *; | [X]EP1762894 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 33; examples 10,11; compounds G-1 *; | [XI]JP2009179619 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [X] 1,7,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0068] , [0096] , [0135]; claims 1,5 * [I] 8,9,13 | International search | [X]JP2005319758 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]JP2008089713 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]JP2008250074 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]JP2009109921 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [X]JP2009179619 (TOYO INK MFG CO); | [XP]JP2010037223 (TOYO INK MFG CO) | by applicant | US2714066 | US3181461 | US3276868 | US3280734 | US3375171 | US3458311 | US3615480 | JPS4643946B | JPS4864183 | JPS4841708B | JPS4842965B | JPS4943191B | JPS5026601 | US3902734 | JPS5137193 | JPS5182102 | JPS5147334B | JPS5230490B | JPS52134692 | JPS53702 | US4153461 | JPS5492723 | JPS5421726B | JPS5425957B | JPS5434327B | JPS5549729 | JPS5534414B | JPS55500806 | US4255513 | JPS5617654B | JPS5675643 | JPS5639464B | JPS5642860B | JPS577427B | JPS57196231 | JPS5812577B | JPS5854341 | JPS5849860B | JPS595240 | JPS595241 | JPS5944615 | JPS5953836 | JPS5971048 | JPS59138205 | JPS6084305 | JPS6122048 | US4575330 | US4590145 | JPS6218537 | JPS6239417B | JPS6239418B | US4689272 | JPS63260909 | JPS63277653 | JPS6433104 | JPH01105238 | JPH01165613 | JPH0140337B | JPH0140336B | JPH0225493 | JPH0216765B | JPH0232293B | JPH02226149 | JPH05142772 | JPH06250387 | JPH06308727 | EP0678534 | DE19700064 | JP2000080068 | JP2001233842 | JP2001253181 | JP2001322365 | JP2005202252 | JP2006078749 | JP2006342166 | JP2007231000 | JP2007302836 | JP4420189B | - W. B. BURNETT, ET AL., "Dialkylaminoalkanol Esters of p-Aminobenzoic Acid", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1937), vol. 59, no. 11, pages 2248 - 2252 | - ALISON ANDERSON, ET AL., "alpha-Amino Acid Phenolic Ester Derivatives: Novel Water-Soluble General Anesthetic Agents Which Allosterically Modulate GABAA Receptors", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 44, no. 22, pages 3582 - 3591 | - JOURNAL OF THE ADHESION SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1984), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 300 - 308 | - M. R. SANDER ET AL., "Benzophenone/triethylamine-photoinitiated polymerization of methyl acrylate", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SOCIETY, (197211), vol. 10, no. 11, pages 3173 - 3181 | - A. KONNO, SID MEETING DIGEST, (2005), page 1380 | - YASUHIRO SHIMA; TAKAAKI YAGI, MONTHLY DISPLAY, (200512), pages 18 - 24,25-30 |