EP2476729 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING STEREO COMPLEX CRYSTALS OF POLYLACTIC ACID, POLYLACTIC ACID, AND MOLDED BODY, SYNTHETIC FIBER, POROUS BODY AND ION CONDUCTOR COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Gunma University 2 Aramaki-machi 4-chome Maebashi-shi, Gunma 371-8510 / JP | [2012/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEHARA, Hiroki c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION GUNMA UNIVERSITY 1-5-1 Tenjin-cho Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-8515 / JP | 02 /
YAMANOBE, Takeshi c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION GUNMA UNIVERSITY 1-5-1 Tenjin-cho Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-8515 / JP | 03 /
KARAKI, Yusuke c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION GUNMA UNIVERSITY 1-5-1 Tenjin-cho Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-8515 / JP | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [2016/33] |
Former [2012/29] | Held, Stephan Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Chemistry Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10815363.6 | 07.09.2010 | [2016/33] | WO2010JP65348 | Priority number, date | JP20090209413 | 10.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009209413 | [2012/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011030766 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2476729 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2476729 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/00, C08G63/08, C08J3/00, C08J9/26, C08L101/16, D01F6/84 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
C08J3/005 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
D01F6/84 (EP,US);
D01F6/92 (EP,US);
C08J2367/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/04, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/04, C08L53/00 (US,EP);
C08L67/04, C08L67/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STEREOKOMPLEXKRISTALLEN AUS POLYMILCHSÄURE SOWIE FORMKÖRPER, SYNTHETIKFASER, PORÖSER KÖRPER UND IONENLEITER DAMIT | [2012/29] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING STEREO COMPLEX CRYSTALS OF POLYLACTIC ACID, POLYLACTIC ACID, AND MOLDED BODY, SYNTHETIC FIBER, POROUS BODY AND ION CONDUCTOR COMPRISING SAME | [2012/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CRISTAUX STÉRÉOCOMPLEXES DE POLY(ACIDE LACTIQUE), POLY(ACIDE LACTIQUE) ET CORPS MOULÉ, FIBRE SYNTHÉTIQUE, CORPS POREUX ET CONDUCTEUR IONIQUE LES COMPRENANT | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2012 | Translation filed | 10.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 19.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2010 | AL | 17.08.2016 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | IT | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | IE | 07.09.2016 | LU | 07.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | FR | 17.10.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | GB | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 07.09.2010 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
LU | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GB | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 07.09.2010 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
LU | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GB | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.09.2010 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
LU | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GB | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.09.2010 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
LU | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GB | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
LU | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GB | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
LU | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FR | 17.10.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JP2008248029 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JP2009001614 (MUSASHINO KAGAKU KENKYUSHO, et al); | [A]JP2005042084 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV, et al); | [A]WO2008081617 (MUSASHINO KAGAKU KENKYUSHO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPS63241024 | JP2007191625 | JPH01225622 | JP2003064174 | JP2008248116 | - MACROMOLECULES, (1991), vol. 24, pages 5651 - 5656 | - POLYMER, (2008), vol. 49, pages 5670 - 5675 | - MAKROMOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 191, pages 481 - 488 | - "KISO KAGAKU KOSU", HIROHIDE MATSUSHITA, KOBUNSHI KAGAKU II -BUSSEI, MARUZEN CO., LTD, (1996), page 68 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, pages 12761 - 12773 | - BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2006), vol. 7, pages 3316 - 3320 | - ACS NANO, (2009), vol. 3, pages 924 - 932 | - BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2009), vol. 10, pages 2053 - 2066 | - MACROMOLECULES, (2006), vol. 39, pages 3971 - 3974 | - POLYMER DEGRADATION AND STABILITY, (2000), vol. 68, pages 445 - 449 | - J. POLYM. SCI., POLYM. PHYS. ED., (2007), vol. 45, page 2632 | - POLYMER, (2008), vol. 49, page 5670 |