EP2478952 - HYDROGEN SEPARATION MEMBRANE AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING HYDROGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo Gas Co., Ltd. 5-20, Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8527 / JP | For all designated states National University Corporation Nagoya University 1 Fo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 464-8601 / JP | For all designated states Institute of National Colleges of Technology, Japan 701-2, Higashiasakawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 193-0834 / JP | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUROKAWA, Hideto c/o TOKYO GAS Co. Ltd. 5-20 Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8527 / JP | 02 /
NISHII, Takumi c/o TOKYO GAS Co. Ltd. 5-20 Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8527 / JP | 03 /
SHIRASAKI, Yoshinori c/o TOKYO GAS Co. Ltd. 5-20 Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8527 / JP | 04 /
YASUDA, Isamu c/o TOKYO GAS Co. Ltd. 5-20 Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8527 / JP | 05 /
MORINAGA, Masahiko c/o Graduate School of Engineering Nagoya University 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | 06 /
YUKAWA, Hiroshi c/o Graduate School of Engineering Nagoya University 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | 07 /
NANBU, Tomonori c/o Suzuka National Colleges of Technology 6742-1 Shiroko-cho Suzuka-shi Mie 510-0294 / JP | 08 /
MATSUMOTO, Yoshihisa c/o Oita National Colleges of Technology 1666 Oaza Maki Oita-shi Oita 870-0152 / JP | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10815492.3 | 14.09.2010 | WO2010JP65788 | Priority number, date | JP20090212357 | 14.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009212357 | [2012/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011030902 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2478952 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/02, C01B3/56, C22C27/02 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
B01D71/022 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/0221 (KR);
B01D53/228 (EP,KR,US);
C01B3/503 (EP,KR,US);
C22C27/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22C9/00 (EP,US);
B01D2311/10 (KR);
B01D2311/14 (KR);
B01D2323/12 (KR);
B01D2325/12 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Title | German: | WASSERSTOFFTRENNMEMBRAN UND WASSERSTOFFTRENNVERFAHREN | [2012/30] | English: | HYDROGEN SEPARATION MEMBRANE AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING HYDROGEN | [2012/30] | French: | MEMBRANE DE SÉPARATION DE L'HYDROGÈNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE L'HYDROGÈNE | [2012/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2012 | Translation filed | 14.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 22.10.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06108196 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]JP2000159503 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JP2001170460 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | [A]JP2004042017 (FUKUDA METAL FOIL POWDER, et al); | [A]JP2007167797 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD); | [A]JP2008080234 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2008088467 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2009226274 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2010240637 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD, et al) | by applicant | US2773561 | US3350846 | JP2000159503 | JP2002206135 | JP2009212357 |