EP2478271 - METHOD FOR CONTROL OF A GEARBOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2015/01] |
Former [2012/30] | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWARTLING, Fredrik c/o Emma Hult Mikrofonvägen 13 S-126 28 Hägersten / SE | 02 /
WÅGBERG, Mikael Parkgatan 16 1tr S-151 44 Södertälje / SE | [2012/40] |
Former [2012/30] | 01 /
SWARTLING, Fredrik Värdsholmsgatan 1A S-151 32 Södertälje / SE | ||
02 /
WÅGBERG, Mikael Parkgatan 16 1tr S-151 44 Södertälje / SE | Representative(s) | Scania CV AB Patents, GP 117kv 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10815715.7 | 14.09.2010 | WO2010SE50985 | Priority number, date | SE20090001182 | 14.09.2009 Original published format: SE 0901182 | [2012/30] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011031232 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2478271 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2478271 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, // F16H59/44, F16H59/48, B60W10/10, B60W30/19 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
F16H61/0213 (EP,SE,US);
B60W10/11 (SE);
B60W10/06 (US);
B60W30/19 (EP,US);
F16H59/44 (SE);
F16H59/48 (EP,SE,US);
F16H61/0204 (SE);
F16H2061/0012 (SE);
F16H2061/0015 (SE);
|
Former IPC [2013/32] | F16H59/48, F16H59/44, B60W10/10, F16H61/02 | ||
Former IPC [2012/30] | F16H61/02, F16H59/44, F16H59/48, B60W10/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES GETRIEBES | [2014/32] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROL OF A GEARBOX | [2012/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER UNE BOÎTE DE VITESSES | [2012/30] |
Former [2012/30] | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES GETRIEBEKASTENS | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 16.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 20.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2010 | AL | 31.12.2014 | AT | 31.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | BG | 31.12.2014 | CY | 31.12.2014 | CZ | 31.12.2014 | DK | 31.12.2014 | EE | 31.12.2014 | ES | 31.12.2014 | FI | 31.12.2014 | HR | 31.12.2014 | IT | 31.12.2014 | LT | 31.12.2014 | LV | 31.12.2014 | MC | 31.12.2014 | MK | 31.12.2014 | MT | 31.12.2014 | NL | 31.12.2014 | PL | 31.12.2014 | PT | 31.12.2014 | RO | 31.12.2014 | SE | 31.12.2014 | SI | 31.12.2014 | SK | 31.12.2014 | SM | 31.12.2014 | TR | 31.12.2014 | NO | 31.03.2015 | GR | 01.04.2015 | IS | 30.04.2015 | IE | 14.09.2015 | LU | 14.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/37] | HU | 14.09.2010 | |
AT | 31.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MK | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PT | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
SM | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 14.09.2010 | |
AT | 31.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MK | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
SM | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 14.09.2010 | |
AT | 31.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
SM | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 31.12.2014 | |
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 31.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003119630 (EDELEN STEPHEN A [US], et al); | [A]WO2007067115 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al) | International search | [A]US4916979 (IRWIN JAMES M [US]); | [A]US6246942 (DOBLER SIEGFRIED [DE], et al); | [X]US6702713 (EDELEN STEPHEN A [US], et al); | [A]WO2007067115 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al); | [A]US2009171543 (SATO HARUKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US2003119630 | WO2007067115 |