EP2476188 - ELECTRIC MACHINES INCLUDING STATOR MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Green Ray Technologies LLC 6450A Mt. Madonna Road Gilroy, California 95020 / US | [2012/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAAMAÑO, Ramon Anthony 6450A Mt. Madonna Road Gilroy California 95020 / US | 02 /
MOYA, Hector Luis 10308 Big Thicket Drive Austin Texas 78747 / US | 03 /
BAKER, David Christopher 2804 Allison Drive Austin Texas 78741 / US | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | Conroy, John, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10815979.9 | 07.09.2010 | WO2010US48019 | Priority number, date | US20090240492P | 08.09.2009 Original published format: US 240492 P | US20090240501P | 08.09.2009 Original published format: US 240501 P | [2012/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011031686 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2476188 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02K37/00, H02K21/24 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
H02K1/148 (EP,US);
H02K21/24 (EP,US);
H02K21/22 (EP,US);
H02K2201/12 (EP,US);
H02K2213/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/29] | H02K37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMASCHINEN MIT STATORMODULEN | [2012/29] | English: | ELECTRIC MACHINES INCLUDING STATOR MODULES | [2012/29] | French: | MACHINES ELECTRIQUES POURVUES DE MODULES STATOR | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 20.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/16] | 15.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.2012 | 30.09.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2014 | 30.09.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2007222325 (CAAMANO RAMON A [US]); | [A]US2003141778 (CAAMANO RAMON A [US]); | [A]US6927524 (PYNTIKOV ALEXANDER V [US], et al); | [A]US6492756 (MASLOV BORIS [US], et al); | [A]US4990809 (ARTUS RICHARD J [US], et al); | [A]WO2007140624 (EXRO TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) |