EP2475400 - NON-RADIOACTIVE PHOSPHOLIPID COMPOUNDS, COMPOSITIONS, AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellectar, Inc. 3301 Agriculture Drive Madison, WI 53716 / US | [2012/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PINCHUK, Anatoly 5212 Nannyberry Drive Madison WI 53711-7301 / US | 02 /
LONGINO, Marc 311 Ridge View Trail Verona WI 53593-8353 / US | 03 /
WEICHERT, Jamey, P. 2765 Rosellen Avenue Fitchburg WI 53711-6506 / US | 04 /
CLARKE, William, R. 6102 Hwy Q Colgate WI 53017 / US | 05 /
VACCARO, Abram, M. 517 Garfield Street Stoughton WI 53589 / US | 06 /
KANDELA, Irawati 466 Hiltop Drive Madison WI 53711 / US | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/34] | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2012/29] | Snodin, Michael D., et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk GB-Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10816122.5 | 10.09.2010 | WO2010US48351 | Priority number, date | US20090241759P | 11.09.2009 Original published format: US 241759 P | US20090241762P | 11.09.2009 Original published format: US 241762 P | US20100309213P | 01.03.2010 Original published format: US 309213 P | US20100309187P | 01.03.2010 Original published format: US 309187 P | [2012/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011031919 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2475400 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/00, A61M36/14 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
A61K51/0408 (EP,US);
A61K31/685 (EP,US);
A61K31/688 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/29] | A61K51/04, A61K31/685, A61K31/688, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Title | German: | NICHT RADIOAKTIVE PHOSPHOLIPIDVERBINDUNGEN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2012/29] | English: | NON-RADIOACTIVE PHOSPHOLIPID COMPOUNDS, COMPOSITIONS, AND METHODS OF USE | [2012/29] | French: | COMPOSÉS PHOSPHOLIPIDIQUES NON RADIOACTIFS, COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 11.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5087721 (COUNSELL RAYMOND E [US], et al); | [A]US5347030 (COUNSELL RAYMOND E [US], et al); | [Y]US6417384 (COUNSELL RAYMOND E [US], et al); | [Y]US7220539 (DU KEYONG [US], et al); | [Y] - BROWNSTEIN., "Clinical Experience with Inorganic, Non-radioactive lodine/lodide.", THE ORIGINAL INTERNIST, (2005), page 107, URL: http://www.optimox.com/pics/lodine/pdfs/IOD09.pdf, (20101012), XP055117644 |