EP2479271 - GLYCEROL-3-PHOSPHATE ACYL TRANSFERASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suntory Holdings Limited 1-40 Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8203 / JP | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OCHIAI Misa c/o Suntory Research Center 1-1-1 Wakayamadai Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-8503 / JP | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/44] |
Former [2012/30] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10817312.1 | 21.09.2010 | [2016/44] | WO2010JP66280 | Priority number, date | JP20090217646 | 18.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009217646 | [2012/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011034199 | Date: | 24.03.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2479271 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2479271 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N1/21, C12P7/64, A61Q19/00, A61K8/99, A23D7/00, A23D9/00, C11B1/00, A61K8/36, C12N9/10 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
C12N9/1029 (EP,US);
C12N15/52 (KR);
A23D7/00 (EP,US);
A23D9/00 (EP,US);
A23L31/00 (EP,US);
A23L31/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/115 (EP,US);
A61K8/361 (EP,US);
A61K8/9728 (EP,US);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C11B1/00 (EP,US);
C12N15/80 (KR);
C12N9/10 (KR);
C12P7/64 (KR);
C12P7/6409 (EP,US);
C12P7/6463 (EP,US);
C12Y203/01015 (EP,US);
A23L7/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/07] | C12N15/09, C12N1/21, C12P7/64, A61Q19/00, A61K8/99, A23D7/00, A23D9/00, C11B1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2012/30] | C12N15/09, A23L1/30, C12N1/21, C12N9/10, C12P7/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLYCEROL-3-PHOSPHAT-ACYL-TRANSFERASE | [2012/30] | English: | GLYCEROL-3-PHOSPHATE ACYL TRANSFERASE | [2012/30] | French: | GLYCÉROL-3-PHOSPHATE ACYL TRANSFÉRASE | [2012/30] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2012 | Translation filed | 23.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 30.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2010 | AL | 02.11.2016 | AT | 02.11.2016 | BE | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | IT | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | NL | 02.11.2016 | PL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | SE | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | SM | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | NO | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.09.2010 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
TR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 21.09.2010 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.09.2010 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.09.2010 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]WO2008156026 (SUNTORY LTD [JP], et al) [XD] 1,5-13 * page 20, paragraph 126 * * page 21, paragraph 129 * * sequence 11 * [I] 2-4; | [XY]US2006094091 (MACOOL DANIEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,5-13 * page 3, paragraph 39 * * page 9, paragraph 95 - page 10, paragraph 97 * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]US2006094092 (DAMUDE HOWARD G [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * page 25, paragraph 276 * * sequence 139 *; | [ ] - "Mortierella alpina glycerol 3-phosphoric acid transacylase, SEQ ID 11.", Geneseq, (20090219), Database accession no. AUM17437, URL: EBI [ ] * the whole document * | [X] - "Mortierella alpina glycerol-3-phosphate o-acyltransferase (GPAT) protein.", Geneseq, (20060629), Database accession no. AEH41536, URL: EBI [X] 1,5-13 * sequence . * | [ ] - "GPAT amino acid sequence - SEQ ID 139.", Geneseq, (20060727), Database accession no. AEH96362, URL: EBI [ ] * sequence . * | [Y] - YUNG-SHENG HUANG ET AL, "Cloning of [Delta]12- and [Delta]6-desaturases from Mortierella alpina and recombinant production of [gamma]-linolenic acid in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", LIPIDS, (19990701), vol. 34, no. 7, doi:10.1007/s11745-999-0410-8, ISSN 0024-4201, pages 649 - 659, XP055008299 [Y] 2-4 * page 650, column 1 * * page 656 - page 657 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11745-999-0410-8 | International search | [A]WO2008156026 (SUNTORY LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008518627 (E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & CO.); | [A]US2006174376 (RENZ ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [A] - MISHRA S. ET AL, "Purification and characterization of thiol-reagent-sensitive glycerol-3-phosphate acyltransferase from the membrane fraction of an oleaginous fungus", BIOCHEM. J., (2001), vol. 355, no. 2, pages 315 - 322, XP008134592 | [A] - CHATRATTANAKUNCHAI S. ET AL, "Oil biosynthesis in microsomal membrane preparations from Mortierella alpina", BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (2000), vol. 28, no. 6, pages 707 - 709, XP008122476 | [A] - KAMISAKA Y. ET AL, "Purification and characterization of diacylglycerol acyltransferase from the lipid body fraction of an oleaginous fungus", J. BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 121, no. 6, pages 1107 - 1114, XP008151095 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/oxfordjournals.jbchem.a021702 | by applicant | WO2004087902 | US2006094091 | WO2008156026 | JP2009217646 | JP2005287403 | - LIPIDS, (2004), vol. 39, page 1147 | - BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1997), vol. 1348, pages 17 - 26 | - BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1997), vol. 1348, pages 10 - 16 | - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 276, no. 45, pages 41710 - 41716 | - THE BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (2001), vol. 355, pages 315 - 322 | - BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, (2000), vol. 28, pages 707 - 709 | - SAMBROOK; RUSSELL, Molecular Cloning; A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR, LABORATORY PRESS, (2001), vol. 3 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 2268 | - PROC. NAIL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 5873 | - ALTSCHUL S. F. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, page 403 | - SAMBROOK; RUSSELL, Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (2001), vol. 3 | - NUC. ACIDS. RES., (1982), vol. 10, page 6487 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1982), vol. 79, page 6409 | - GENE, (1985), vol. 34, page 315 | - NUC. ACIDS. RES., (1985), vol. 13, page 4431 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 488 | - J. B. C., (2001), vol. 276, no. 45, pages 41710 - 41716 | - MYCOTAXON, (1992), vol. XLIV, no. 2, pages 257 - 265 | - APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 65, pages 419 - 425 | - MARIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, page 337 | - JUNJI INOKOSHI ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 64, page 660 | - HUSSAIN ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 101, page 149 | - MACKENXIE D. A. ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 66, pages 4655 - 4661 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1978), vol. 75, page 1929 | - J. BACTERIOLOGY, (1983), vol. 153, page 163 | - SAMBROOK; RUSSELL, Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, vol. 3 | - Methods in Yeast Genitics, A laboratory manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS | - BIOSCI. BIOTECH. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 59, pages 1221 - 1228 |