EP2478450 - TELECOMMUNICATION SERVICE EMPLOYING AN ELECTRONIC INFORMATION REPOSITORY STORING SOCIAL NETWORK USER, DEVELOPER, AND MOBILE NETWORK OPERATOR INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telesocial, Inc. 39 Mesa Street Suite 101 San Francisco, CA 94129 / US | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAYTENA, William, L. 538a Simonds Loop San Francisco, CA 94129 / US | 02 /
STONE, Eric, T. 334 Ulloa San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor, Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor, Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 10817899.7 | 17.09.2010 | WO2010US49302 | Priority number, date | US20090243562P | 18.09.2009 Original published format: US 243562 P | US20100358690P | 25.06.2010 Original published format: US 358690 P | [2012/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011035136 | Date: | 24.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2478450 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, H04W4/20, H04L29/08, H04L29/06, H04W12/08, // H04W8/18 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
H04W4/21 (EP,US);
G06F21/45 (US);
H04L12/66 (US);
H04L51/52 (US);
H04L63/0281 (US);
H04L63/083 (US);
H04L63/0876 (US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
H04L65/102 (US);
H04L65/1073 (US);
H04L67/10 (US);
H04L67/303 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (US);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (US);
H04W12/084 (EP,US);
H04W4/14 (EP,US);
H04W4/16 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W88/16 (US);
H04W8/18 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/30] | G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Title | German: | TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSDIENST MIT EINEM ELEKTRONISCHEN INFORMATIONS-REPOSITORY ZUR SPEICHERUNG VON INFORMATIONEN ÜBER BENUTZER EINES SOZIALEN NETZWERKS, ENTWICKLER UND BETREIBER MOBILER NETZWERKE | [2012/30] | English: | TELECOMMUNICATION SERVICE EMPLOYING AN ELECTRONIC INFORMATION REPOSITORY STORING SOCIAL NETWORK USER, DEVELOPER, AND MOBILE NETWORK OPERATOR INFORMATION | [2012/30] | French: | SERVICE DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION EMPLOYANT UN RÉPERTOIRE ÉLECTRONIQUE D'INFORMATIONS MÉMORISANT DES INFORMATIONS D'UTILISATEUR, DE DÉVELOPPEUR ET D'OPÉRATEUR DE RÉSEAU MOBILE DE RÉSEAU SOCIAL | [2012/30] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 15.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 14.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/25] | Divisional application(s) | EP17150960.7 / EP3176704 | EP17150962.3 / EP3176705 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.04.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008255946 (ALTBERG EBBE [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,10-14 * paragraph [0088] - paragraphs [0108] , [0226] * [I] 2,3,7-9,15; | [I]GB2450385 (HUTCHISON WHAMPOA THREE G IP [BS]) [I] 2,3,7-9,15 * page 4, line 23 - page 23, line 19; figures 2,4a,4b *; | [XI]WO2009101629 (ISHAI RON [IL]) [X] 1,4-6,10-14 * page 9 - page 10 * * page 15 - page 17 * [I] 2,3,7-9,15; | [XPI]US2010020952 (LEUNG YIU KAU [US], et al) [XP] 1,4-6,10-14 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0053] * [I] 2,3,7-9,15; | [XP]WO2010093744 (VOLT DELTA RESOURCES LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1,4-6,10-14* paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0028] * | International search | [A]US2004205200 (KOTHARI NIKHIL [US], et al); | [Y]US2006167890 (MILLER GRANT D [US], et al); | [A]US2007208845 (RAHEMAN FAZAL [IN], et al); | [Y]US2007220092 (HEITZEBERG JOE [US], et al); | [Y]US2008084982 (CHATTERJEE KOUSHIK [US]) |